EP1598384 - NOVEL POLYMER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-8622 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARIMOTO, Kikuo Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 02 /
MORIGUCHI, Nobuhiro Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 03 /
OHGI, Hiroyuki Kuraray Co., Ltd. 41, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 04 /
KOMIYA, Yukiatsu Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
ARIMOTO, Kikuo Kuraray Co., Ltd., 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIGUCHI, Nobuhiro Kuraray Co., Ltd., 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | |||
03 /
OHGI, Hiroyuki Kuraray Co., Ltd., 41, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | |||
04 /
KOMIYA, Yukiatsu Kuraray Co., Ltd., 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04713637.9 | 23.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004JP02074 | Priority number, date | JP20030053028 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003053028 | [2005/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004076523 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1598384 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598384 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/08 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
C08G61/08 (EP,US);
Y10S525/94 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Title | German: | NEUES POLYMER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/47] | English: | NOVEL POLYMER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2005/47] | French: | NOUVEAU POLYMERE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2005 | Translation filed | 11.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2004 | AT | 11.04.2012 | BE | 11.04.2012 | CY | 11.04.2012 | CZ | 11.04.2012 | DK | 11.04.2012 | EE | 11.04.2012 | FI | 11.04.2012 | NL | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SE | 11.04.2012 | SI | 11.04.2012 | SK | 11.04.2012 | TR | 11.04.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | GR | 12.07.2012 | ES | 22.07.2012 | PT | 13.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 11.04.2012 | |
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 11.04.2012 | |
SE | 11.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0018579 (CRYOVAC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 5 - line 17 * * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 4 * * page 8, line 6 - page 11, line 26 * * examples 5-7 * * table 2 * * claim 1 *; | [PX]WO03078499 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-4 * figures 1-3,7 * * page 15, line 1 - line 16 * * table I *; | [X] - RAMAKRISHNAN S, "Well-Defined Ethylene-vinyl alcohol copolymers via hydroboration: Control of composition and distribution of the hydroxyl groups on the polymer backbone", MACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1991), vol. 24, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 3753 - 3759, XP002251245 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * scheme 1 * * table II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00013a003 | [X] - RAMAKRISHNAN S ET AL, "POLY(5-HYDROXYOCTENYLENE) AND ITS DERIVATIVES: SYNTHESIS VIA METATHESIS POLYMERIZATION OF AN ORGANOBORANE MONOMER", MACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19901015), vol. 23, no. 21, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 4519 - 4524, XP000174801 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * schemes I,IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00223a004 | [X] - HILLMYER M A ET AL, "RING-OPENING METATHESIS POLYMERIZATION OF FUNCTIONALIZED CYCLOOCTENES BY A RUTHENIUM-BASED METATHESIS CATALYST", MACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19950828), vol. 28, no. 18, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 6311 - 6316, XP000521212 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * scheme 1 * * figure 3 * * table 3 * * equations 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00122a043 | [A] - DEMONCEAU A ET AL, "NOVEL RUTHENIUM-BASED CATALYST SYSTEMS FOR THE RING-OPENING METATHESIS POLYMERIZATION OF LOW-STRAIN CYCLIC OLEFINS", MACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19970602), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 3127 - 3136, XP000691127 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * schemes 2-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma961040j | International search | [Y]JP2002509961 ; | [A]US2002058812 (GRUBBS ROBERT H [US], et al); | [Y]JP2003500412 | Examination | - SCHERMAN O.A.; WALKER R.; GRUBBS R.H., "Synthesis of Regioregular and Stereoregular Ethylene Vinyl Alcohol Copolymers Via Romp of a Protected Cyclooctene-5,6-(cis and trans)-Diol", POLYMER PREPRINTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20030224), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 952 - 953 | - REDDY VENUMBAKA, CONFIRMATION E-MAIL OF PUBLICATION DATE OF POLYMER PREPRINTS, VOL. 44(1) 2003 |