EP1596905 - SPINAL FLUID INTRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith and Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCARBOROUGH, Nelson 430 River Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | 02 /
HAMILTON, John, V. 31 Hill Street Foxborough, MA 02035 / US | 03 /
UCHIDA, Andy, H. 121 Laurel Way Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 04 /
MCNALL, Ralph, I. 10 Primrose Way, No. 5108 Haverhill, MA 01830 / US | 05 /
LEPKE, Steven 2 Wicker Lane Wakefield, MA 01880 / US | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2005/47] | Connors, Martin L.H. Smith & Nephew Plc Research Centre York Science Park Heslington, York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 04713709.6 | 23.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004US05195 | Priority number, date | US20030448529P | 21.02.2003 Original published format: US 448529 P | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004075954 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1596905 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145, A61M5/168 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
A61M5/1456 (EP,US);
A61B17/3401 (EP,US);
A61B17/8822 (EP,US);
A61M5/16854 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0007 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M5/16827 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINFÜHRUNG VON LIQUOR | [2005/47] | English: | SPINAL FLUID INTRODUCTION | [2005/47] | French: | INTRODUCTION DE FLUIDE SPINAL | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/26] | 21.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 08.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | Divisional application(s) | EP12168580.4 / EP2489378 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2011 | 28.02.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003028144 (DUCHON DOUGLAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0013] - [0022] *; | [X]US2002016567 (HOCHMAN MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,11,12,14-18 * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] *; | [X]US6159161 (HODOSH MILTON [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,11,12,14-18 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 45 *; | [X]US6368314 (KIPFER URS [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,11,12,14-18 * column A *; | [A]EP1110567 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 19-22 * column A *; | [X]US5808203 (NOLAN JR WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 23-27 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2003028144 | US5808203 |