EP1601618 - WATER TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS WITH MASKING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PUR Water Purification Products, Inc. One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states PUR Water Purification Products, Inc. One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOUTER, Philip, Frank The Nook, The Green Longhorsely Morpeth, Northumberland NE65 8UP / GB | 02 /
URE, Colin 43 Bewick Park Wallsend, Tyne and Wear NE28 9RU / GB | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane, Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2009/50] | Wilding, Richard Alan, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centre Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2005/49] | Wilding, Richard Alan, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04713714.6 | 23.02.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004US05270 | Priority number, date | US20030371864 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: US 371864 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004076364 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601618 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601618 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/76, C02F1/68, C02F1/56, A01N59/00 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
C02F1/76 (EP,KR,US);
A01N59/00 (EP,US);
A01N65/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/50 (EP,US);
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C02F1/68 (EP,US);
C02F1/688 (EP,US);
C02F2103/02 (EP,US);
C02F2303/02 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (EP,US);
C02F2303/185 (EP,US);
C02F9/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N59/00, A01N25/08, A01N65/36 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2005/49] | C02F1/76, C02F1/68, C02F1/56, A01N59/00, // A01N59/00, A01N65/00, A01N25/32, A01N25/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERBEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MASKIERUNGSMITTEL | [2005/49] | English: | WATER TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS WITH MASKING AGENT | [2005/49] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU COMPRENANT UN AGENT MASQUANT | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 24.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.02.2010 | BE | 03.02.2010 | CY | 03.02.2010 | DK | 03.02.2010 | EE | 03.02.2010 | FI | 03.02.2010 | NL | 03.02.2010 | RO | 03.02.2010 | SI | 03.02.2010 | SK | 03.02.2010 | IE | 23.02.2010 | LU | 23.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | BG | 03.05.2010 | GR | 04.05.2010 | PT | 03.06.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/07] | AT | 03.02.2010 | |
BE | 03.02.2010 | ||
CY | 03.02.2010 | ||
DK | 03.02.2010 | ||
EE | 03.02.2010 | ||
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
NL | 03.02.2010 | ||
RO | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
SK | 03.02.2010 | ||
IE | 23.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.05.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 03.02.2010 | |
BE | 03.02.2010 | ||
CY | 03.02.2010 | ||
EE | 03.02.2010 | ||
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
NL | 03.02.2010 | ||
RO | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
SK | 03.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.05.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 03.02.2010 | |
BE | 03.02.2010 | ||
CY | 03.02.2010 | ||
EE | 03.02.2010 | ||
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
NL | 03.02.2010 | ||
RO | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
SK | 03.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 03.02.2010 | |
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
NL | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 03.02.2010 | |
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
NL | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 03.02.2010 | |
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 03.02.2010 | |
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | PT | 03.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH01176487 ; | JPH01176487 [ ]; | [X]JPH0538360 ; | JPH0538360 [ ]; | [A]US5075025 (WAINBERG MARK A [CA], et al) [A] 1-36 * column A *; | [X]US5571519 (SYNODIS JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11,34,35 * column 2, lines 42-60 * * column 3, lines 11-15 * * claims 1,2,7,14-16 *; | [AD]WO0200557 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [AD] 1-36* the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891016), vol. 013, no. 457, Database accession no. (C - 644), & JP01176487 A 19890712 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [X] 16-18 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 34, Database accession no. 1989-244482, XP002287718 & JPH01176487 A 19890712 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930624), vol. 017, no. 333, Database accession no. (C - 1074), & JP05038360 A 19930219 (NAOKI UJIFUKU) [X] 25 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 12, Database accession no. 1993-096436, XP002287717 & JPH0538360 A 19930219 (UJIFUKU N) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH01176487 | US5075025 | JPH0538360 | US5571519 | WO0200557 | WO03011769 |