EP1597607 - A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR DETECTING DISCONTINUITIES IN A MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Socomate International Zone Industrielle 8, rue des Abbesses 77580 Crecy La Chapelle / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Socomate International Zone Industrielle, 8, rue des Abbesses 77580 Crecy La Chapelle / FR | ||
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Socomate International Zone Industrielle, 8, rue des Abbesses 77580 Crecy La Chapelle / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COPERET, Philippe 15, rue des Bourgognes F-77700 Coupvray / FR | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Burbaud, Eric Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Burbaud, Eric Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04713896.1 | 24.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004EP02568 | Priority number, date | FR20030002255 | 24.02.2003 Original published format: FR 0302255 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004074864 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597607 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1597607 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G01V1/28 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
G01N29/4427 (EP,US);
G01N29/11 (EP,US);
G01N29/4472 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US);
G01N2291/106 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | G01S7/52, G01V1/28, G01N29/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON DISKONTINUITÄTEN IN EINEM MEDIUM | [2005/47] | English: | A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR DETECTING DISCONTINUITIES IN A MEDIUM | [2005/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE DISCONTINUITES DANS UN MILIEU | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 15.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.04.2010 | 27.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.03.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2010 | BE | 21.07.2010 | CY | 21.07.2010 | CZ | 21.07.2010 | DK | 21.07.2010 | EE | 21.07.2010 | FI | 21.07.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | IT | 21.07.2010 | NL | 21.07.2010 | RO | 21.07.2010 | SI | 21.07.2010 | SK | 21.07.2010 | TR | 21.07.2010 | BG | 21.10.2010 | GR | 22.10.2010 | ES | 01.11.2010 | PT | 22.11.2010 | IE | 24.02.2011 | LU | 24.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
TR | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2011 | ||
LU | 24.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2011 | ||
LU | 24.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
NL | 21.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1175700 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-10* page 1, line 11 - page 4, line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [XAY]US4441369 (LESSARD DENNIS E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 11 * * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 31 * * column 8, lines 19-33 * [A] 4-6 [Y] 7; | [XAY]US5319554 (PADHI TRILOCHAN [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 57 * * column 7, lines 45-50 * [A] 4-6 [Y] 7; | [A]US6049509 (SONNELAND LARS [NO], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 4-31 * * column 4, lines 14-39 *; | [A]US6049508 (DEFLANDRE JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [A] 2 * column 3, lines 42-58 *; | [Y]WO0203099 (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US]) [Y] 7 * page 1, lines 7-10 * * page 15, lines 24-26 * * page 16, lines 3-5 * | by applicant | US4441369 | FR2696573 | US5319554 |