EP1599065 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL ACTUATOR AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAMIKI SEIMITSU HOUSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 8-22, Shinden 3-chome, Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8511 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states NAMIKI SEIMITSU HOUSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 8-22, Shinden 3-chome, Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8511 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Minoru, Namiki Seimitsu Houseki KK 8-22, Shinden 3-chome Adachi-ku, Tokyo 123-8511 / JP | 02 /
KANEDA, Shouichi, Namiki Seimitsu Houseki KK 8-22, Shinden 3-chome Adachi-ku, Tokyo 123-8511 / JP | 03 /
OHNO, Etsuo, Namiki Seimitsu Houseki KK 5-1, Aza Koyashikizoe, Oaza Shimomenaizawa Kuroishi-shi, Aomori 0360539 / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | Sties, Jochen Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04714437.3 | 25.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004JP02195 | Priority number, date | JP20030051050 | 27.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003051050 | [2005/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004077879 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1599065 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/02, // H04R1/02 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
H04R9/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/025 (KR);
H04R1/02 (EP,US);
H04R1/086 (EP,US);
H04R2400/03 (KR);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | H04R9/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, FI, FR, GB, LI, SE [2006/24] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFUNKTIONS-AKTOR UND MOBILENDGERÄT | [2005/47] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL ACTUATOR AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2005/47] | French: | ACTIONNEUR POLYVALENT ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2005 | Translation filed | 26.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 17.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 02.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2013 | 28.02.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0845920 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4* figure 10 *; | [X]EP1075126 (POLYMATECH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037]; figures 9a,9b *; | [X]KR20020020379 (SWP SHINWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP1257147 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0108]; figure 9 *; | [PX]WO03057375 (NAMIKI PRECISION JEWEL CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2001225010 (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS); | [Y]JP2001353471 (TOKIN CORP); | [Y]JP2000325881 (TOKIN CORP); | [Y]JP2001102769 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH10187160 (CITIZEN ELECTRON CO LTD) | Examination | JPH11266489 | US6211775 | EP1257148 | by applicant | JP2001293436 | JP2002219413 | KR20020020379 | EP1075126 | EP1257147 | WO03057375 | US6211775 | EP1257148 |