EP1719002 - A SIMPLIFIED POLARIZATION RECOVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL JR, Estill, Thone 9978 Niagara Drive Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | 02 /
DRAZIC, Valter 7 Allee du Pigeon Blanc F-35830 Betton / FR | 03 /
RIDENOUR, Jason, Alan 17230 Moonlite Drive South Bend, Indiana 46614 / US | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/45] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe Thomson multimedia European Patents Operations 46, quai Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04714569.3 | 25.02.2004 | [2006/45] | WO2004US05480 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005085920 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1719002 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
G02B5/3058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/22] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VEREINFACHTES POLARISATIONSRÜCKGEWINNUNGSSYSTEM | [2006/45] | English: | A SIMPLIFIED POLARIZATION RECOVERY SYSTEM | [2006/45] | French: | SYSTEME DE RECUPERATION DE POLARISATION SIMPLIFIE | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 10.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/50] | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1180711 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-14 * column 9, line 54 - column 11, line 20; figure 1 *; | [X]WO02095487 (CORNING PREC LENS INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 4, line 10 - page 7, line 22 *; | [X]US2003184864 (BRUZZONE CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2003210379 (MAGARILL SIMON [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 * |