EP1599579 - TRANSLOCATING ENZYME USED AS A SELECTION MARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINTZ, Maren Ziegelstrasse 41 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
FREUDL, Roland Isolastrasse 1 52353 Düren / DE | 03 /
FEESCHE, Jörg Georg-Büchner-Strasse 23 40699 Erkrath / DE | 04 /
BREVES, Roland Schwalbenweg 5 40822 Mettmann / DE | [2005/48] | Application number, filing date | 04715290.5 | 27.02.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004EP01949 | Priority number, date | DE20031009557 | 04.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10309557 | [2005/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004078953 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1599579 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1599579 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12N1/20, C12N15/31, C07K14/195 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C12N15/74 (EP,US);
C12N9/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN TRANSLOKATIONSENZYM ALS SELEKTIONSMARKER | [2005/48] | English: | TRANSLOCATING ENZYME USED AS A SELECTION MARKER | [2005/48] | French: | ENZYME DE TRANSLOCATION SERVANT DE MARQUEUR DE SELECTION | [2005/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | IE | 02.04.2008 | RO | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | PT | 03.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/50] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
GR | 03.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | EE | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 02.04.2008 | |
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0251579 (ENTEROVAX RES PTY LTD [AU]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [X]WO9626276 (US HEALTH [US], et al) [X] 32-36,38,39 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0894857 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 32-36,38,39 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0972838 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]WO0229113 (NOVOZYMES BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 32-39 *99,89% identity in 1761 nt overlap (total 2706 nt) of SEQ ID NO: 1838 with SEQ ID NO: 5 *; | [X]WO02077183 (ELITRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 32-39 *98,26% identity in 2706 nt overlap (total 2706 nt) of SEQ ID NO: 20233 with SEQ ID NO: 3; *; | [X] - SADAIE Y ET AL, "SEQUENCING REVEALS SIMILARITY OF THE WILD-TYPE DIV-POSITIVE GENE OF BACILLUS-SUBTILIS TO THE ESCHERICHIA-COLI SEC-A GENE", GENE (AMSTERDAM), (1991), vol. 98, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 101 - 105, XP002283176 [X] 32-39 * 100% identity in 4148 nt overlap (total 4148) of Fig. 2 with SEQ ID NO: 1; 100% identity in 841 aa overlap (total 841 aa) of Fig. 2 with SEQ ID NO: 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(91)90110-W | [X] - WELCH R A ET AL, "Extensive mosaic structure revealed by the complete genome sequence of uropathogenic Escherichia coli.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, December 24, 2002, (20021224), vol. 99, no. 26, ISSN 0027-8424 (ISSN print), pages 17020 - 17024, XP002283177 [X] 32-39 * 100% identity in 901 aa overlap (total 901 aa) of Q8FL61 (AE016755) with SEQ ID NO: 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.252529799 |