EP1606140 - ADJUSTABLE AND FOLDABLE BOOSTER CAR SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meeker R & D, Inc. 11847 Abbott Road Hiram, OH 44234 / US | For all designated states Meeker, Paul, K. 11847 Abbott Road Hiram, OH 44234 / US | For all designated states Gibson, William, R. 621 S. Depeyster St. Kent, OH 44240 / US | [2005/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEEKER, Paul, K. 11847 Abbott Road Hiram, OH 44234 / US | 02 /
GIBSON, William, R. 621 S. Depeyster St. Kent, OH 44240 / US | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street GB-London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04716110.4 | 01.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004US06191 | Priority number, date | US20030248998 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: US 248998 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004080241 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1606140 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/26, A47C7/54 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
B60N2/2866 (EP,US);
B60N2/2806 (EP,US);
B60N2/2851 (EP,US);
B60N2/286 (EP,US);
B60N2/2872 (EP,US);
B60N2/2878 (EP,US);
B60N3/102 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTELLBARER UND UMKLAPPBARER ZUSATZAUTOSITZ | [2005/51] | English: | ADJUSTABLE AND FOLDABLE BOOSTER CAR SEAT | [2005/51] | French: | SIEGE D'AUTO POUR ENFANT REGLABLE ET PLIABLE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 27.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5803543 (HARTMANN JOHANNES [DE]); | [X]US5769495 (VAIRINEN ERKKI [FI]); | [Y]US4854639 (BURLEIGH DAVID W [GB], et al); | [Y]US5845968 (LOVIE DAVID [GB]); | [Y]US2002190547 (KAIN JAMES M [US]); | [A]US290344 ; | [A]US480822 ; | [A]US6491348 (KAIN JAMES M [US]); | [A]US6623074 (ASBACH RONALD M [US], et al) | by applicant | US4854639 | US5769495 | US5803543 | US5845968 |