EP1630801 - OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HABUTA, Haruhiko x x / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Ken'ichi x x / JP | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ, Günther Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Eisenführ, Günther Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716364.7 | 02.03.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004JP02585 | Priority number, date | JP20030146207 | 23.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003146207 | [2006/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004105008 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630801 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/2585 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/24062 (EP,US);
G11B7/257 (KR);
G11B7/258 (EP,US);
G11B7/266 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24312 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24314 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24316 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/35] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND PROZESS ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2006/09] | English: | OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2006/09] | French: | SUPPORT OPTIQUE D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2005 | Translation filed | 23.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/11] | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0192256 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,10,11 * page 8 - page 11; figure 2; table 1 *; | [X]EP1122723 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * sentence 11; table 2 *; | [A]US6312780 (KASAMI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1178476 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-11 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0063] , [0064] *; | [PX]EP1343158 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,4,5,11* paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0014] - [0016] - [0018] , [0023] * | International search | [X]JP2002230840 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH); | [Y]JP2003059130 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2003059105 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | EP0192256 | EP1178476 | JP2002237098 |