EP1600956 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR MAGNETIC RECORDING MEDIUM AND PRODUCTION DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2009/51] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATTORI, Kazuhiro c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1038272 / JP | 02 /
TAKAI, Mitsuru c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1038272 / JP | 03 /
SUWA, Takahiro c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1038272 / JP | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Geyer, Ulrich F. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716374.6 | 02.03.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004JP02588 | Priority number, date | JP20030058381 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003058381 | JP20030101570 | 04.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003101570 | [2005/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004079725 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600956 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1600956 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/855 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G11B5/855 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
C23C16/00 (KR);
G11B5/74 (EP,US);
G11B5/743 (EP,US);
G11B5/84 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN MAGNETISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND HERSTELLUNGSEINRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2005/48] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR MAGNETIC RECORDING MEDIUM AND PRODUCTION DEVICE THEREFOR | [2005/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE | [2005/48] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2004 | Translation filed | 29.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 16.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.03.2010 | FR | 31.03.2010 | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/07] | FR | 31.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0339813 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,20,21* columns 4-6; figures 1A-1H *; | [XA]US2002136927 (HIEDA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,20,21 * paragraphs [0116] - [0119]; figures 2A-2D * [A] 3-19,22-26 | International search | [A]JPH0997419 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH0340219 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2000322710 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP, et al); | [A]JP2001216633 (ANELVA CORP, et al); | [A]JP2000268338 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2002523852 | by applicant | JPH0997419 | JP2000322710 | US2002136927 | JP2001323381 | JP2000091290 |