EP1608012 - METHOD OF FORMING TRENCH ISOLATION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AZ Electronic Materials USA Corp. 70 Meister Avenue Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2005/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIYAMA, Masaaki C/o AZ Electronic Materials (Japan) K.K. 3330, Chihama, Daito-cho, Ogasa-gun Shizuoka 437-1412 / JP | 02 /
NAGURA, Teruno C/o AZ Electronic Materials (Japan) K.K. 3330, Chihama, Daito-cho, Ogasa-gun Shizuoka 437-1412 / JP | 03 /
ISHIKAWA, Tomonori C/o AZ Electronic Materials (Japan) K.K., Bunkyo Green Court, 28-8 Honkomagome 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | 04 /
SAKURAI, Takaaki C/o AZ Electronic Materials (Japan) K.K., Bunkyo Green Court, 28-8 Honkomagome 2-chome, Bunkyo- ku, Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | 05 /
SHIMIZU, Yasuo C/o AZ Electronic Materials (Japan) K.K.3330, Chihama, Daito-cho Ogasa-gun, Shizuoka 437-1412 / JP | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte, Isenbruck - Bösl - Hörschler - Wichmann - Huhn, Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716765.5 | 03.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004JP02638 | Priority number, date | JP20030058365 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003058365 | [2005/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004079819 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1608012 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/762 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
H01L21/76224 (EP,US);
H01L21/762 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BIILDUNG EINER GRABENISOLATIONSSTRUKTUR | [2005/51] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING TRENCH ISOLATION STRUCTURE | [2005/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UNE STRUCTURE D'ISOLATION DE TRANCHEE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2005 | Translation filed | 04.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 13.11.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6265437 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH03101148 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH0497542 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2000114362 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2001203264 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2001308090 (TONENGENERAL SEKIYU KK); | [Y]JP2002170877 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2003507887 ; | [A] - HEO J-H, ET AL, "Void free and low stress shallow trench isolation technology using P-SOG for sub 0.1 mum device", 2002 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI TECHNOLOGY DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, (200206), pages 132 - 133, XP001109849 | [AP] - HEO J-H, ET AL, "The P-SOG filling shallow trench isolation technology for sub-70nm device", 2003 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI TECHNOLOGY DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, (200306), pages 155 - 156, XP002980514 | [AP] - CHOI J-S, ET AL, "A shallow trench isolation using novel polysilazane-based SOG for deep-submicron technologies and beyond", 2003 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING, (200310), pages 419 - 422, XP010667486 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSM.2003.1243316 |