EP1611642 - DURABLE ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY WITH CONDUCTIVE ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIVIGALPITIYA, Ranjith Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
KANNO, David A. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
JANNIC, Patrice Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
ARNOLD, Christophe Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
SABATIER, Richard Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
CONNELL, Glen Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04716886.9 | 03.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004US06487 | Priority number, date | US20030411163 | 10.04.2003 Original published format: US 411163 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004095644 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611642 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/04, C09J9/02, H05K3/32 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
C09J9/02 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01R4/04 (EP,US);
H05K3/323 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29499 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8319 (EP,US);
H01L2224/838 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01009 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01025 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01057 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0665 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0781 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07811 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0245 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0248 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0281 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07811, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dauerhaftige electronische Verbindung mit leitender Klebe | [2014/33] | English: | DURABLE ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY WITH CONDUCTIVE ADHESIVE | [2006/01] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE ELECTRONIQUE DURABLE COMPRENANT UN ADHESIF CONDUCTEUR | [2006/01] |
Former [2006/01] | DAUERHAFTE ELEKTRONISCHE ANORDNUNG MIT LEITFÄHIGEM KLEBER | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/11] | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003051807 (YAMAGUCHI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-36 * column W *; | [X] - LYONS A M ET AL, "ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE ADHESIVES", HANDBOOK OF ADHESIVE TECHNOLOGY, XX, XX, (1994), pages 565 - 584, XP000607106 [X] 1-36 * the whole document * |