EP1603706 - CONTACT SURFACE FOR A CRIMPING ROLLER IN A ROLL FORMING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLEGEL CORPORATION 111 Eighth Avenue New York City, NY 10011 / US | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENAU, Keith, W. 900 E. Whitcomb Madison Heights, MI 48071 / US | 02 /
KONITSNEY, William 900 E. Whitcomb Madison Heights, MI 48071 / US | 03 /
ROYSE, Marion, A. 2714 Muscadine Drive Maryville, TN 37803 / US | 04 /
LAGERSTROM, Michael, J. 900 E. Whitcomb Madison Heights, MI 48071 / US | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Schober, Christoph D., et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Schober, Christoph D., et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober, Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04717381.0 | 04.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004US06504 | Priority number, date | US20030386038 | 11.03.2003 Original published format: US 386038 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004080644 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603706 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23P19/04, B25B27/00, B60J10/00 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
B23P19/047 (EP,US);
B60J10/45 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53791 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/24] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTOBERFLÄCHE EINER QUETSCHROLLE EINES PROFILWALZWERKZEUGS | [2005/50] | English: | CONTACT SURFACE FOR A CRIMPING ROLLER IN A ROLL FORMING TOOL | [2005/50] | French: | SURFACE DE CONTACT POUR ROULEAU DE SERTISSAGE DANS UN OUTIL DE PROFILAGE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 02.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/12] | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0018601 (DRAFTEX IND LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 11, line 2 - line 26 *; | [XY]US2001013163 (MENGUC ISMAIL [US]) [X] 24 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0042] * [Y] 16-23,25-28; | [Y]US5451198 (LANCASTER JOSEPH L [US]) [Y] 16-23,25-28 * the whole document *; | [A]US5940950 (GALAT DONALD E [US]) [A] 24-31 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002029455 (ARMELLINI ART [US], et al) [A] 24-31 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041]; figures 3-5 * |