EP1613783 - METHOD FOR THE THERMOMECHANICAL TREATMENT OF STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thyssenkrupp Federn und Stabilisatoren GmbH Oeger Strasse 85 58119 Hagen / DE | [2017/13] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Bilstein Suspension GmbH August-Bilstein-Strasse 4 58256 Ennepetal / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Automotive AG Alleestrasse 165 44793 Bochum / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VONDRACEK, Hans Am Bollwerk 4 58339 Brekerfeld / DE | 02 /
DZIEMBALLA, Hans Im Markenfeld 25 58642 Iserlohn / DE | 03 /
MANKE, Lutz Brucknerstr. 58 58097 Hagen / DE | 04 /
BOROWIKOW, Alexander Bernauer Weg 5 16230 Sydower Fliess / DE | 05 /
UHRICH, Reinhard Strasse 33, Nr. 29 13129 Berlin / DE | 06 /
HÜTTNER, Matthias Freiheit 154 06493 Strassberg / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2006/02] | 01 /
VONDRACEK, Hans Am Bollwerk 4 58339 Brekerfeld / DE | ||
02 /
DZIEMBALLA, Hans Im Markenfeld 25 58642 Iserlohn / DE | |||
03 /
MANKE, Lutz Brucknerstr.58 58097 Hagen / DE | |||
04 /
BOROWIKOW, Alexander Bernauer Weg 5 16230 Sydower Fliess / DE | |||
05 /
UHRICH, Reinhard Strasse 33, Nr. 29 13129 Berlin / DE | |||
06 /
HÜTTNER, Matthias Freiheit 154 06493 Strassberg / DE | Representative(s) | Adams, Steffen, et al ThyssenKrupp AG Patentabteilung Q1, 5. Etage ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [N/P] | Adams, Steffen, et al ThyssenKrupp Technologies AG Legal - Patents Am Thyssenhaus 1 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Adams, Steffen, et al ThyssenKrupp Technologies AG Legal - Patents Am Thyssenhaus 1 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04717575.7 | 05.03.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004EP02281 | Priority number, date | DE20031015418 | 04.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10315418 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004087968 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1613783 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613783 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/06, C21D9/02, C21D1/42 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
C21D8/06 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/18 (KR);
C21D8/00 (KR);
C21D9/02 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/42 (EP,US);
C21D2221/01 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/02] | C21D8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR THERMOMECHANISCHEN BEHANDLUNG VON STAHL | [2006/02] | English: | METHOD FOR THE THERMOMECHANICAL TREATMENT OF STEEL | [2006/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT THERMO-MECANIQUE DE L'ACIER | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2004 | CY | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | AT | 05.03.2018 | GB | 05.03.2018 | IE | 05.03.2018 | LU | 05.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 05.03.2004 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
AT | 05.03.2018 | ||
GB | 05.03.2018 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | DK | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
AT | 05.03.2018 | ||
GB | 05.03.2018 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | DK | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
GB | 05.03.2018 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IE | 05.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | DK | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 05.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | DK | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | DK | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | DK | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0974676 (MUHR & BENDER [DE]) [AD] 1-24 * claims 1-15 *; | [AD]DE19637968 (UNIV FREIBERG BERGAKADEMIE [DE]) [AD] 1-24 * claims 1,2 *; | [AD]DE19546204 (MAX PLANCK INST EISENFORSCHUNG [DE]) [AD] 1-24 * claims 1-4 *; | [AD]DE4340568 (SENDNER THERMO TEC ANLAGEN GMB [DE]) [AD] 1-24 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0263300 (BRUENINGHAUS KRUPP GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO8901529 (BISHOP A E [AU]); | [A]GB2289231 (NETUREN CO LTD [JP]) |