EP1618034 - BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karbon Kinetics Limited 202 West Block, Forum Magnum Square London SE1 7GL / GB | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORPE, Richard 202 West Block, Forum Magnum Square London SE1 7GL / GB | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 04717683.9 | 05.03.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004GB00941 | Priority number, date | GB20030007429 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: GB 0307429 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004087493 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1618034 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1618034 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62M11/16, B62K25/32 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
B60B27/04 (EP,US);
B60B27/0047 (EP,US);
B60B27/023 (EP,US);
B60B3/14 (EP,US);
B60B3/16 (EP,US);
B62K25/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRRAD | [2006/04] | English: | BICYCLE | [2006/04] | French: | BICYCLETTE | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 21.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07075544.2 / EP1842769 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.08.2007 | BE | 29.08.2007 | CH | 29.08.2007 | CY | 29.08.2007 | CZ | 29.08.2007 | EE | 29.08.2007 | FI | 29.08.2007 | LI | 29.08.2007 | PL | 29.08.2007 | RO | 29.08.2007 | SI | 29.08.2007 | SK | 29.08.2007 | TR | 29.08.2007 | BG | 29.11.2007 | SE | 29.11.2007 | GR | 30.11.2007 | ES | 10.12.2007 | PT | 29.01.2008 | HU | 01.03.2008 | IE | 05.03.2008 | LU | 05.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | FR | 25.04.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/13] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
TR | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
HU | 01.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
TR | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
HU | 01.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
HU | 01.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
BG | 29.11.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CY | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
CH | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LI | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 29.08.2007 | |
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 10.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE880712 (KLAUE HERMANN DR-ING) [A] 7,13,16,20 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]GB2171656 (SANDERS MARK ANDREW) [Y] 3 * figure -; claims 1,19-21 *; | [Y]US4659097 (KUEPPER GERD [DE], et al) [Y] 8-10,17,18,21-23 * figures 6,7; claim - *; | [Y]FR2618402 (PARYZAK RENE [FR]) [Y] 6,15 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3804342 (KLAUE HERMANN [DE]) [Y] 9,17,18,21-23 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE19840576 (SRAM DE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10,12-23 * column 2, line 15 - line 45; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1142780 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,12,19* figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP1270395 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10,12-23 * column 3, line 34 - line 51; figure 12 * |