EP1682809 - PLUG-IN CONNECTION FOR PIPE CONDUITS AND HOSE LINES WITH AN INCLINED SEALING RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henn GmbH & Co.KG Steinebach 18 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMANN, Harald Schweizer Strasse 63 A-6830 Rankweil / AT | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 04718199.5 | 06.03.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004EP02314 | Priority number, date | DE20031047728 | 14.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10347728 | [2006/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005047752 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682809 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/088 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
F16L37/0885 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/46] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKVERBINDUNG FÜR ROHR- UND SCHLAUCHLEITUNGEN MIT SCHRÄGDICHTRING | [2006/30] | English: | PLUG-IN CONNECTION FOR PIPE CONDUITS AND HOSE LINES WITH AN INCLINED SEALING RING | [2006/30] | French: | RACCORDEMENT PAR EMBOITEMENT POUR CONDUITES ET TUYAUX, A BAGUE D'ETANCHEITE A FACE OBLIQUE | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 16.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]NL271155 (ROLLMAPLAST A. G.) [X] 1-3,6 * figure 4 * [Y] 7; | [Y]DE29917186U (BODE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE4236323 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5887911 (KARGULA CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR1352055 (LUITPOLDHUETTE AG) [A] 4,5 * figure 1 * |