EP1657809 - POWER CONVERTER, MOTOR DRIVE, BTB SYSTEM AND SYSTEM LINKING INVERTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Circle for the Promotion of Science and Engineering 12-1, Ookayama 2-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKAGI, Hirofumi, c/o Tokyo Institute Of Technology 2-12-1, Ookayama Meguro-ku, Tokyo 1528550 / JP | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04718423.9 | 08.03.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004JP02962 | Priority number, date | JP20030298852 | 22.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003298852 | [2006/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005020420 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1657809 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
H02M5/4585 (EP,US);
H02M3/33584 (EP,US);
H02M7/4807 (EP,US);
H02M7/797 (EP,US);
H02M1/007 (EP,US);
H02M1/0074 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/48] |
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEUMSETZER, MOTORANTRIEB, BTB-SYSTEM UND SYSTEM-VERBINDUNGSWECHSELRICHTERSYSTEM | [2006/20] | English: | POWER CONVERTER, MOTOR DRIVE, BTB SYSTEM AND SYSTEM LINKING INVERTER SYSTEM | [2006/20] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE, MOTEUR, SYSTEME BTB ET SYSTEME INVERSEUR DE LIAISON DE SYSTEME | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2006 | Translation filed | 21.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19941170 (WEH HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1,3,4* figure 1a *; | [XY] - HEINEMANN L ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "An actively cooled high power, high frequency transformer with high insulation capability", APEC 2002. 17TH. ANNUAL IEEE APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION. DALLAS, TX, MARCH 10 - 14, 2002; [ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020310), vol. CONF. 17, ISBN 978-0-7803-7404-1, pages 352 - 357, XP010582944 [X] 3-8 * paragraph [00II]; figure 2 * [Y] 1,2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2002.989270 | [Y] - RODRIQUEZ J ET AL, "HIGH VOLTAGE MULTILEVEL CONVERTER WITH REGENERATION CAPABILITY", 30TH ANNUAL IEEE POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. PESC 99. RECORD. CHARLESTON; [ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (19990101), ISBN 978-0-7803-5422-7, pages 1077 - 1082, XP000924579 [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003]; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1999.785645 | International search | [X]JPH10285833 (HOKURIKU ELECTRIC POWER, et al); | [X]JPH08228484 (NIPPON ELECTRIC IND) |