EP1602034 - COMMUNICATIONS INTERCHANGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTV Solutions Inc. 244 5th Avenue, 4th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALSEVICH, Miguel 437 West 46th St., Apt 5FE New York, NY 10036 / US | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Lacey, Dean Andrew, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Lacey, Dean Andrew, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2005/49] | Watkins, Rosalind Philippa Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04718490.8 | 08.03.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004US06809 | Priority number, date | US20030453634P | 11.03.2003 Original published format: US 453634 P | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004081725 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1602034 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L61/103 (EP,US);
H04L61/2514 (EP,US);
H04L61/45 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSAUSTAUSCHSYSTEM | [2005/49] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS INTERCHANGE SYSTEM | [2005/49] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECHANGE DE COMMUNICATION | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 30.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5771355 (KUZMA ANDREW J [US]); | [X]US5796393 (MACNAUGHTON BRUCE A [US], et al); | [X]US5815667 (CHIEN ANTHONY H [US], et al); | [X]US6023724 (BHATIA RAJIV [US], et al); | [X]US6057832 (LEV EITAN [IL], et al); | [X]US6256663 (DAVIS HUGH O [US]); | [Y]US6366958 (AINSWORTH SPENCER JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]US6446137 (VASUDEVAN RANGASWAMY [US], et al) |