EP1601842 - REINFORCING ELEMENTS AND REINFORCED CONCRETE OR PRESTRESSED CONCRETE PARTS PRODUCED BY MEANS OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fachhochschule Giessen-Friedberg Wiesenstrasse 14 35390 Giessen / DE | [2010/39] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Fachhochschule Gießen-Friedberg Wiesenstr. 14 35390 Giessen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÜNTHER, Gerd Mittelweg 49 63619 Bad Orb / DE | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Buchhold, Jürgen Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft Bettinastrasse 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Buchhold, Jürgen Patentanwälte Olbricht & Buchhold, Am Weinberg 15 35096 Weimar/Lahn / DE | Application number, filing date | 04718614.3 | 09.03.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004DE00458 | Priority number, date | DE2003110715 | 10.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10310715 | [2005/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004081313 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601842 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601842 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/16, E04C5/06 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
E04C5/18 (EP,US);
E04C5/0645 (EP,US);
E04C5/168 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEHRUNGSELEMENTE UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE STAHL- ODER SPANNBETONTEILE | [2005/49] | English: | REINFORCING ELEMENTS AND REINFORCED CONCRETE OR PRESTRESSED CONCRETE PARTS PRODUCED BY MEANS OF THE SAME | [2005/49] | French: | ELEMENTS D'ARMATURE ET PIECES EN BETON ARME OU PRECONTRAINT PRODUITES AVEC CES ELEMENTS D'ARMATURE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 26.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09005165.7 / EP2075388 | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | HU | 29.09.2010 | IE | 29.09.2010 | IT | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | PL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | ES | 09.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | LU | 09.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 09.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 09.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 09.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 09.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | FI | 29.09.2010 | |
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | FI | 29.09.2010 | |
SI | 29.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB606288 (JONES WILLIAM T, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,14-20,29-35,39-42 * figures 3,5 *; | [X]US3238684 (PETER WOOD JOHN) [X] 1-4,6,8-12,14-16,29-34,36,37,39-42 * column 3, line 19 - line 39; figures 1,5-7 *; | [XA]US4283896 (FRICKER SIEGFRIED, et al) [X] 1,2,7,14,15,19,20 * column 3, line 33 - line 38; figures 1,2 * [A] 22; | [A]DE8708056U (STEIMLE ALOIS) [A] 1,23-25* figure - *; | [XP]WO2004016874 (FRISCH HANS [DE]) [XP] 1,2,6,8,14-16,19,21 * figures 5,6,8 * | Examination | GB166172 | US4765109 | JPH0827956 | by applicant | DE1913104 | DE7118881U | DE2111243 | DE29814923U |