EP1621822 - HUMIDITY CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | For all designated states Ikegami, Shuji X / JP | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEGAMI, Shuji, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, LTD., 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
YABU, Tomohiro, Kanaoka Factory, Sakai Plant Daikin Industries, LTD., 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04718764.6 | 09.03.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004JP03051 | Priority number, date | JP20030063186 | 10.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003063186 | JP20030344034 | 02.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003344034 | [2006/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004081460 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621822 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/00, F24F1/02, F24F3/147, B01D53/26 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
F24F1/022 (EP,US);
F24F3/14 (KR);
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
F24F1/00 (KR);
F24F3/12 (KR);
F24F3/1411 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUCHTIGKEITSREGELVORRICHTUNG | [2006/05] | English: | HUMIDITY CONTROL DEVICE | [2006/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION D'HUMIDITE | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2005 | Translation filed | 23.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 26.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61238322 (TOYO TEKKO KK) [A] 1 * the whole document ** abstract *; | [Y]JPH07265649 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [DY]JPH08189667 (HITACHI LTD) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [A]JP2001201106 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document * * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH07755 (SANDEN CORP); | [A]JPH09210367 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2003035436 (DAIKIN IND LTD) |