EP1723758 - CROSS-ENCODING OF INFORMATION IN INDEPENDENT CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCNEELY, David, Lowell 7832 Warbler Court Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR European Patent Operations 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/47] | Berthier, Karine THOMSON, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04718843.8 | 09.03.2004 | [2006/47] | WO2004US07114 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005099206 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1723758 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/00 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
H04L1/0065 (EP,US);
H04L27/00 (KR);
H04B7/00 (KR);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/24] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREUZCODIERUNG VON INFORMATIONEN IN UNABHÄNGIGEN KANÄLEN | [2006/47] | English: | CROSS-ENCODING OF INFORMATION IN INDEPENDENT CHANNELS | [2006/47] | French: | CODAGE CROISE D'INFORMATIONS DANS DES CANAUX INDEPENDANTS | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 28.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/49] | 18.07.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0800292 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-22* the whole document * | International search | [X]US4864615 (BENNETT CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al); | [A]US5237610 (GAMMIE KEITH [CA], et al); | [X]US6424717 (PINDER HOWARD G [US], et al) | by applicant | US4864615 | US5237610 | EP0800292 | US6424717 |