EP1608507 - FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kodak Canada ULC 800-855 West Georgia Street Vancouver, British Colombia V6C 3H1 / CA | [2018/11] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Kodak Graphic Communications Canada Company 3700 Gilmore Way Burnaby BC V5G 4M1 / CA | ||
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Creo, Inc. 3700 Gilmore Way Burnaby, B.C. V5G 4M1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCREA, Devon, James 404-4788 Hazel Street Burnaby, B.C. V5H 4V9 / CA | 02 /
MILLER, Stephen, Hughes 3609 Spruell Drive Silver Springs, MD 20902-2366 / US | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2010/08] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/52] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04718872.7 | 09.03.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004US07336 | Priority number, date | CA20032422132 | 11.03.2003 Original published format: CA 2422132 | US20030453544P | 12.03.2003 Original published format: US 453544 P | US20030736216 | 15.12.2003 Original published format: US 736216 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004080722 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1608507 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1608507 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/00, B41C1/02, B41M1/04, B41N1/12, G03F7/20, H04N1/405, G03F5/12, B41C1/05 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G03F7/2022 (EP,US);
B41C1/00 (EP,US);
B41C1/02 (EP,US);
B41M1/04 (EP,US);
B41N1/12 (EP,US);
G03F7/2055 (EP,US);
H04N1/405 (EP,US);
H04N1/4057 (EP,US);
B41C1/05 (EP,US);
G03F5/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/52] | B41C1/00, B41N1/12, G03F7/20, B41M1/04 | ||
Former IPC [2005/52] | B41C1/00, B41N1/12, G03F7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/45] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLEXODRUCK | [2005/52] | English: | FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING | [2005/52] | French: | IMPRESSION FLEXOGRAPHIQUE | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 07.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2004 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | IE | 09.03.2019 | LU | 09.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4101324 (MIZUNO MASAYOSHI, et al) [Y] 18 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 1; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0169294 (OSAKA SEIHAN CT KYOGYO KUMIAI [JP]) [Y] 15,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US5884560 (OPITZ JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XY]DE10116672 (JUERGENSEN HEINRICH [DE]) [X] 1-14,16-17,20-26 * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0053]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 15,18-19 | International search | [Y]US4101324 (MIZUNO MASAYOSHI, et al); | [Y]US4610950 (MILLIKEN ROBERT D [JP]); | [Y]US2002083855 (SAMWORTH MARK [US]); | [Y]WO02085625 (INNOVATIVE ELASTICS LTD [IE], et al); | [AP]US2003084803 (GROSS LAWRENCE W [US]); | [AT]US2004130753 (CROUNSE KENNETH R [US]) | by applicant | US4101324 | EP0169294 | DE10116672 |