EP1723657 - MAGNETIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DET International Holding Limited Scotia Center, 4th Floor George Town Grand Cayman / KY | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRINGETT, Nigel Vordere Poche 20b 79104 Freiburg i.B. / DE | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Rüfenacht, Philipp Michael, et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | Rüfenacht, Philipp Michael, et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 04718897.4 | 10.03.2004 | [2006/47] | WO2004CH00141 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005086185 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1723657 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723657 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/28, H01F27/22, H05K1/16 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
H01F27/2804 (EP,US);
H01F27/22 (EP,US);
H05K1/165 (EP,US);
H05K1/0203 (EP,US);
H05K1/021 (EP,US);
H05K1/056 (EP,US);
H05K1/141 (EP,US);
H05K1/182 (EP,US);
H05K2201/086 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE EINRICHTUNG | [2006/47] | English: | MAGNETIC DEVICE | [2006/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF MAGNETIQUE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 17.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | BE | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | CZ | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | EE | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | IT | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | PL | 10.12.2008 | RO | 10.12.2008 | SI | 10.12.2008 | SK | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | BG | 10.03.2009 | GB | 10.03.2009 | IE | 10.03.2009 | LU | 10.03.2009 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | HU | 11.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
LU | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
HU | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
LU | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0507360 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 5, lines 6-50; figure 1 * * column 6, lines 13-32; figure 3 ** column 10, line 47 - column 11, line 14 *; | [A]GB2317751 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 7 *; | [A]US5949191 (CASSESE BRUNO [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7,8 * abstract * * column 2, lines 27-65 *; | [AD]US6069548 (BAARMAN GOESTA [FI], et al) [AD] 1,7,11 * abstract *; | [A]US6073339 (LEVIN GEDALY [US]) [A] 1,7,11 * column 10, lines 12-48 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 18 * * figures 1,4-12 *; | [A]US6466454 (JITARU IONEL [US]) [A] 1,5-8,11 * column 7, lines 28-37,52-64 * * column 8, lines 44-56 * * figures 11,13b,15c * |