EP1603769 - LOAD BEARING VEHICLE FLOOR MATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Automotive Components Group North America, Inc. 5300 Auto Club Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Collins & Aikman Products Co. 250 Stephenson Highway Troy, MI 48083 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEHMER, Steven G. 2454 Findley Circle NW Uniontown, OH 44685 / US | 02 /
PUTT, Maureen R. 5570 Stoney Ridge Road NW Canton, OH 4718 / US | 03 /
JEZEWSKI, Michael C. 1375 Battlesburg SW East Sparta, OH 44626 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
SEHMER, Steven G. 8353 Turquois Avenue North Canton, OH 44721 / US | ||
02 /
PUTT, Maureen R. 5054 Monticello Avenue NW Canton, OH 44708 / US | |||
03 /
JEZEWSKI, Michael C. 1375 Battlesburg SW East Sparta, OH 44626 / US | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Horner, Martin Grenville Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2005/50] | Horner, Martin Grenville Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square GB-Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04719745.4 | 11.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004US07309 | Priority number, date | US20030455994P | 19.03.2003 Original published format: US 455994 P | US20040797775 | 10.03.2004 Original published format: US 797775 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004085195 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1603769 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60N3/04, B62D25/20 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
B60R5/04 (EP,US);
B60N3/044 (EP,US);
B60R13/011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASTTRAGENDE FAHRZEUGBODENMATTEN | [2005/50] | English: | LOAD BEARING VEHICLE FLOOR MATS | [2005/50] | French: | TAPIS DE PLANCHER PORTEURS POUR VEHICULES | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 20.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6290278 (LOVELAND EARL P [US]); | [A]US6467829 (KALUSZKA MEDARD E [US], et al); | [A]US5979962 (VALENTIN ERHARD [DE], et al); | [A]US5178434 (KREBS BERND [DE]); | [A]US2001040382 (NEMOTO SHUICHI [JP]) |