EP1602134 - LUMINISCENCE CONVERSION OF LED WITH PHOSPHORESCENCE EFFECT, USE THEREOF AND OPERATIONAL METHOD ASSOCIATED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2008/13] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Osram Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnitzstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Osram Opto Semiconductors GmbH Wernerwerkstrasse 2 93040 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSSNER, Wolfgang Dekan-Imminger-Str. 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Much, Florian Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/03] | Zedlitz, Peter OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/49] | Pokorny, Gerd, et al OSRAM GmbH, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04719919.5 | 12.03.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004DE00505 | Priority number, date | DE2003111056 | 13.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10311056 | [2005/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004082032 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1602134 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
H01L33/50 (EP,US);
H01L33/502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2006/25] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUMINESZENZKONVERSIONS-LED MIT NACHLEUCHTEFFEKT UND DEREN VERWENDUNG SOWIE ZUGEH RIGES BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2005/49] | English: | LUMINISCENCE CONVERSION OF LED WITH PHOSPHORESCENCE EFFECT, USE THEREOF AND OPERATIONAL METHOD ASSOCIATED THEREWITH | [2005/49] | French: | DEL A CONVERSION DE LUMINESCENCE POSSEDANT UN EFFET DE PHOSPHORESCENCE ET UTILISATION DE LADITE DEL, AINSI QUE PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT ASSOCIE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09146482 ; | [A]EP0279032 (IBM [US]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 5 - line 8 *; | [DA]DE19638667 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19930174 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [DA] 8 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09146482 A 19970606 (NICHIA CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - SELLA C ET AL, "R.F.-SPUTTERED LUMINESCENT RARE EARTH AND YTTRIUM OXYSULPHIDE FILMS", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19820416), vol. 90, no. 2, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 181 - 185, XP001105581 [A] 6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(82)90647-2 |