EP1603399 - A SOURDOUGH, THE USE THEREOF AND BAKERY PRODUCTS OBTAINABLE FROM THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/50] | A SOUR DOUGH, THE USE THEREOF AND BAKERY PRODUCTS PRODUCED FROM THE SAME | ||
[2009/29] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Opposition rejected | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LESAFFRE et Cie 41, rue Etienne Marcel F-75001 Paris / FR | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEJEUNE, Pascal 20, rue de Florence F-59200 Tourcoing / FR | 02 /
BRYCKAERT, Emilie 118, boulevard d'Armentières,Appt. 23 F-59100 Roubaix / FR | 03 /
FONCHY-PENOT, Evelyne 2, rue Claude Monet F-62840 Fleurbaix / FR | 04 /
COLAVIZZA, Didier Parc de Beaumont , 2 allée des Ormes 59100 Roubaix / FR | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
LEJEUNE, Pascal 20, rue de Florence F-59200 Tourcoing / FR | ||
02 /
BRYCKAERT, Emilie 118, boulevard d'Armentières,Appt. 23 F-59100 Roubaix / FR | |||
03 /
FONCHY-PENOT, Evelyne 2, rue Claude Monet F-62840 Fleurbaix / FR | |||
04 /
COLAVIZZA, Didier Rés. "Les Cyclades",Appt. K303 78, rue d'Athènes F-59777 Euralille / FR | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | August & Debouzy avocats, et al 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/49] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2005/50] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04719993.0 | 12.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004EP02626 | Priority number, date | EP20030005610 | 12.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03005610 | EP20030017340 | 31.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03017340 | [2005/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004080187 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603399 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1603399 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A21D8/04, A21D13/00 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
A21D8/045 (EP,US);
A21D10/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUERTEIG, VERWENDUNG DAVON UND DARAUS ERHÄLTLICHE BÄCKEREIPRODUKTE | [2009/29] | English: | A SOURDOUGH, THE USE THEREOF AND BAKERY PRODUCTS OBTAINABLE FROM THE SAME | [2009/29] | French: | LEVAIN PANAIRE, SON UTILISATION ET PRODUITS DE BOULANGERIE CUITS SUSCEPTIBLES D'ÊTRE OBTENUS | [2005/50] |
Former [2005/50] | SAUERTEIG, VERWENDUNG DAVON UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE BÄCKEREIPRODUKTE | ||
Former [2005/50] | A SOUR DOUGH, THE USE THEREOF AND BAKERY PRODUCTS PRODUCED FROM THE SAME | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.2010
29.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE Der Backzutatenverband e.V. Markt 9 53111 Bonn / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | 02
22.09.2010
29.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE PURATOS N.V. Industrialaan 25 Zone Maalbeek 1702 Groot-Bijgaarden / BE Opponent's representative Desaix, Anne Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.2010
29.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE Der Backzutatenverband e.V. Markt 9 53111 Bonn / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
22.09.2010
29.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE PURATOS N.V. Industrialaan 25 Zone Maalbeek 1702 Groot-Bijgaarden / BE Opponent's representative Desaix, Anne Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2010/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.2010
29.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE Der Backzutatenverband e.V. Markt 9 53111 Bonn / DE Opponent's representative Hofmann, Stefan Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
22.09.2010
29.09.2010
ADMISSIBLE PURATOS N.V. Industrialaan 25 Zone Maalbeek 1702 Groot-Bijgaarden / BE Opponent's representative Desaix, Anne Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | 02.11.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.05.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.07.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.09.2013 | 10.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.03.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.12.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/11] | Appeal following opposition | 07.05.2014 | Appeal received No. T1067/14 | 19.12.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.12.2009 | EE | 23.12.2009 | RO | 23.12.2009 | TR | 23.12.2009 | LU | 12.03.2010 | BG | 23.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2010/50] | CY | 23.12.2009 | |
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | EE | 23.12.2009 | |
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | EE | 23.12.2009 | |
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001204376 ; | [A]US3681083 (EVERSON CHARLES W) [A] 1-6,8-21 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]FR2716077 (OMNIUM RECH BIOLOG APPLI [FR]) [A] 1-6,8-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5500231 (BUENSOW RUDOLF [DE], et al) [A] 1-6,8-21 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20116067U (PIEMONTE IMP WARENHANDELSGMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6,8-21 * the whole document * * page 9, lines 18-20 *; | [A]US6465027 (TAILLADE PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-6,8-21 * claims 1-20,30-32,34-39,46,47 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001204376 A 20010731 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6,8-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0012]; claim 3 * | [A] - BRÜMMER J M ET AL, "Zur Situation der Konservierung von Backwaren.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, (1989), Database accession no. 89-1-11-m0003, XP002285013 [A] 21 * abstract * | [ ] - GETREIDE MEHL UND BROT, DETMOLD, GERMANY, (1988), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 17 - 21 | [A] - ROSENQUIST H ET AL, "THE ANTIMICROBIAL EFFECT OF ORGANIC ACIDS, SOUR DOUGH AND NISIN AGAINST BACILLUS SUBTILIS AND B. LICHENIFORMIS ISOLATED FROM WHEAT BREAD", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, (1998), vol. 85, no. 3, ISSN 1364-5072, pages 621 - 631, XP008022618 [A] 21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2672.1998.853540.x |