EP1688873 - ENTERPRISE EVALUATION DEVICE AND ENTERPRISE EVALUATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Property Bank Corp. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | For all designated states Masuyama, Hiroaki 501, 9-30, Sakuranomachi 6-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0054 / JP | [2008/49] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Intellectual Property Bank Corp. 21-19, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Masuyama, Hiroaki 501, 9-30, Sakuranomachi 6-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUYAMA, Hiroaki 501, 9-30, Sakuranomachi 6-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 5600054 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMOTO, Kaoru, Villa White Nagasaki 102 29-3, Nagasaki 6-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0051 / JP | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street GB-London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04720221.3 | 12.03.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004JP03354 | Priority number, date | JP20030396346 | 23.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003396346 | [2006/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050510 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688873 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
G06Q40/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (KR);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERNEHMENSBEWERTUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND UNTERNEHMENSBEWERTUNGSPROGRAMM | [2006/32] | English: | ENTERPRISE EVALUATION DEVICE AND ENTERPRISE EVALUATION PROGRAM | [2006/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EVALUATION D'ENTREPRISES ET PROGRAMME D'EVALUATION D'ENTREPRISES | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2006 | Translation filed | 17.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 24.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [A]JP2003233703 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2003331102 (MIZUHO CORPORATE BANK LTD); | [X] - HANAEDA H. ET AL., "Keiei zaimu to joho.", Kabushiki kaisha chou keizaisha., (19890725), pages 37 - 57, XP002989400 |