EP1603640 - SPRINKLER INSTALLATION FOR RAILWAY VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens AG Österreich Siemensstraße 92 1210 Wien / AT | [2010/01] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Siemens Transportation Systems GmbH & Co. KG Leberstrasse 34 1110 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUMMIG, Thomas Lautensackgasse 41/1 A-1140 Wien / AT | 02 /
PENZ, Peter Werndlgasse 41 A-2230 Gänserndorf / AT | 03 /
LEIKER, Fritz Akaziengasse 35-37/5 A-1230 Wien / AT | 04 /
LEBEDA, Christian Taborstrasse 89/78 A-1200 Wien / AT | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | Peham, Alois Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/50] | Matschnig, Franz, et al Patentanwalt, Siebensterngasse 54, Postfach 252 1071 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04720551.3 | 15.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004AT00090 | Priority number, date | AT20030000442 | 19.03.2003 Original published format: AT 4422003 | [2005/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004082768 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603640 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A62C3/02 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
A62C3/07 (EP,US);
B61K13/00 (EP,US);
G08B17/06 (EP,US);
A62C35/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CZ, ES, GB, GR, HU [2006/26] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRINKLERANLAGE FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE | [2005/50] | English: | SPRINKLER INSTALLATION FOR RAILWAY VEHICLES | [2005/50] | French: | INSTALLATION D'EXTINCTION AUTOMATIQUE POUR VEHICULES FERROVIAIRES | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 17.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/07] | 07.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0522671 (AEG WESTINGHOUSE TRANSPORT [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, lines 5-35 *; | [Y]DE10015030 (PREUSSAG AG MINIMAX [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 1, lines 41-56 *; | [Y]EP0650743 (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * column 1, lines 1-34 - column 3, lines 3-32 *; | [Y]GB2215204 (STEEL JAMES) [Y] 4 * page 7, columns 23-32 *; | [Y]US5797457 (SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]) [Y] 5 * column 1, lines 34-49 *; | [A]GB516902 (LEROY MOODY LEWIS) [A] 6 * page 1, lines 51-101 * |