EP1606572 - HIGH-STRENGTH PLANAR STRUCTURES FOR END-BALLISTIC PROTECTION AND PROTECTION AGAINST WEAR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADLER, Jörg Schlossstufen 2 01662 Meissen / DE | 02 /
IHLE, Jan Postfach 11 A-8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT | [2007/03] |
Former [2005/51] | 01 /
ADLER, Jörg Schlossstufen 2 01662 Meissen / DE | ||
02 /
IHLE, Jan Augsburger Str. 83 01277 Dresden / DE | Representative(s) | Rauschenbach, Marion Rauschenbach Patentanwälte Bienertstrasse 15 01187 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Rauschenbach, Marion Rauschenbach Patentanwälte, Bienerstrasse 15 01187 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04720579.4 | 15.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004DE00586 | Priority number, date | DE20031013231 | 19.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10313231 | [2005/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004083768 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1606572 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1606572 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/04 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
F41H5/0492 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFESTE FLÄCHENGEBILDE FÜR ENDBALLISTISCHEN SCHUTZ UND VERSCHLEISSSCHUTZ UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2005/51] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH PLANAR STRUCTURES FOR END-BALLISTIC PROTECTION AND PROTECTION AGAINST WEAR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2005/51] | French: | STRUCTURE PLATE HAUTEMENT RESISTANTE POUR LA PROTECTION BALISTIQUE ET LA PROTECTION CONTRE L'USURE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LADITE STRUCTURE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 21.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.07.2008 | CZ | 02.07.2008 | DK | 02.07.2008 | EE | 02.07.2008 | FI | 02.07.2008 | IE | 02.07.2008 | IT | 02.07.2008 | NL | 02.07.2008 | PL | 02.07.2008 | RO | 02.07.2008 | SI | 02.07.2008 | SK | 02.07.2008 | BG | 02.10.2008 | SE | 02.10.2008 | GR | 03.10.2008 | PT | 02.12.2008 | HU | 03.01.2009 | AT | 15.03.2009 | LU | 15.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
HU | 03.01.2009 | ||
AT | 15.03.2009 | ||
LU | 15.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
AT | 15.03.2009 | ||
LU | 15.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
AT | 15.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
AT | 15.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | FI | 02.07.2008 | |
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | NL | 02.07.2008 | |
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 02.07.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3134341 (EIDGENOESS MUNITIONSFAB THUN [CH]) [X] 1-4,6-9,13-17 * page 4, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 6, paragraph 7 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4483020 (DUNN ANTHONY G [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 41 - line 59 * * figure 4 *; | [X]US5736474 (THOMAS HOWARD L [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 56 - line 62 * * column 8, line 28 - line 63 ** figure 2 *; | [X]US5804757 (WYNNE ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 7, line 8 - line 17 * * claims 3-7,12-14,16 * * figures 7-10 *; | [X]EP0967453 (ARMORTEC INC [GR]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-12,16-18 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] - [0014] - [0017] , [0019] , [0022] , [0027] , [0030] , [0039] , [0041] , [0045] , [0047] * * figure 4 * | by applicant | DE3426457 | DE19856597 | US6332390 |