EP1635411 - FUEL BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Noboru Sentai,Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 558-0047 / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/11] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04720699.0 | 15.03.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004JP03392 | Priority number, date | JP20030072702 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003072702 | [2006/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004084332 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635411 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/04, H01M8/06, H01M8/12 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
H01M8/1253 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/04022 (EP,US);
H01M8/04097 (EP,US);
H01M8/06 (KR);
H01M8/10 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/25] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFBATTERIE | [2006/11] | English: | FUEL BATTERY | [2006/11] | French: | BATTERIE DE PILES A COMBUSTIBLE | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2005 | Translation filed | 10.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 11.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2003959495 ; | [A]JPH10967558 ; | [Y]WO0154220 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al); | [Y]JP2001307546 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2002246047 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y] - HIROSHI IWAHARA, TAKASHI HIBINO, TAMOTSU YAJIMA, "Perovskite-gate sankabutsu o bozai to shita koshitsugata proton dendosei ceramics ni kansuru kenkyu", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1993), no. 9, pages 1003 - 1011, XP002982790 | [Y] - TANIGUCHI N., HATOH K., NIIKURA J., GAMO T., "solid state ionics", (1992), vol. 998, pages 53 - 56, XP000417335 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-2738(92)90283-U |