|
19.01.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2023 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2023 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
19.04.2023 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
03.11.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.10.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.10.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2022 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.05.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.04.2022 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.03.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2022 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2021 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2020 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2019 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Invitation to confirm documents filed by fax |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
45 |