EP1614302 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK INCLUDING DIRECTIONAL AND OMNIDIRECTIONAL COMMUNICATION LINKS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne, Florida 32919 / US | [2011/18] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne Florida 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAIN, Joseph, Bibb 200 Melbourne Avenue Indialantic, FL 32903 / US | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04720822.8 | 15.03.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004US07850 | Priority number, date | US20030400998 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: US 400998 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004095764 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1614302 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1614302 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/08, // H04W72/12 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
H04L1/203 (EP,US);
H04W40/12 (KR);
H04B7/0491 (EP,US);
H04B7/2643 (EP,US);
H04J3/1694 (EP,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0061 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W40/06 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/02] | H04Q7/20, H04Q7/00, H04B1/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2006/27] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK MIT DIREKTIONALEN UND OMNIDIREKTIONALEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSTRECKEN UND DIESBEZÜGLICHE VERFAHREN | [2006/02] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK INCLUDING DIRECTIONAL AND OMNIDIRECTIONAL COMMUNICATION LINKS AND RELATED METHODS | [2006/02] | French: | RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL COMPRENANT DES LIAISONS DE COMMUNICATION DIRECTIONNELLES ET OMNIDIRECTIONNELLES ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02063836 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [X]US2002158801 (CRILLY WILLIAM J [US], et al) | International search | [Y]EP1067730 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [Y]US2002119808 (SEIKI YOSHIHIRO [JP]); | by applicant | WO02063836 |