EP1735501 - A DEVICE FOR THE APPLICATION AND/OR REMOVAL OF RAIL CLIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEMBRE S.p.A. Via Serenissima 9 25135 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states CEMBRE S.p.A. Via Serenissima 9 I-25135 Brescia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAREZZANI, Gualtiero Via Giovanni XXIII, 27 I-25062 S. Vigilio-Concesio (Brescia) / IT | 02 /
BRAGA, Cesare Via Maria Malibran, 7 I-25131 Brescia / IT | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/52] | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04720967.1 | 16.03.2004 | [2006/52] | WO2004IT00125 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005088013 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1735501 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1735501 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01B29/24 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
E01B29/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN UND/ODER ENTFERNEN VON SCHIENENKLEMMEN | [2006/52] | English: | A DEVICE FOR THE APPLICATION AND/OR REMOVAL OF RAIL CLIPS | [2006/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'APPLICATION ET/OU LE RETRAIT D'ATTACHES DE RAILS | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2008 | BE | 09.07.2008 | CY | 09.07.2008 | CZ | 09.07.2008 | DK | 09.07.2008 | EE | 09.07.2008 | FI | 09.07.2008 | IT | 09.07.2008 | NL | 09.07.2008 | PL | 09.07.2008 | RO | 09.07.2008 | SI | 09.07.2008 | SK | 09.07.2008 | TR | 09.07.2008 | BG | 09.10.2008 | SE | 09.10.2008 | GR | 10.10.2008 | ES | 20.10.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | HU | 10.01.2009 | GB | 16.03.2009 | IE | 16.03.2009 | LU | 16.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
GB | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 16.03.2009 | ||
LU | 16.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
GB | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 16.03.2009 | ||
LU | 16.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
GB | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 16.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
GB | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 16.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 16.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 16.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 09.07.2008 | |
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000038704 ; | [X]US4068593 (LEEVES GEOFFREY GORDON) [X] 1 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 41; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5074219 (THEURER JOSEF [AT], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]US5586502 (WEBER ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 6, lines 7-64; figures 5,7 * [A] 8,24; | [XA]US5839377 (BRENNY DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1 * columns 8,9; figures 1,2,4,6,8-10 * [A] 24; | [XA]GB2333115 (ROSENQVIST FORVALTNINGS AB A [SE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 24 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000038704 A 20000208 (HOSOKAWA SEIJI) [A] 1 * abstract * |