EP1604358 - INFORMATION STORAGE MEDIUM AND METHOD OF RECORDING AND/OR REPRODUCING DATA THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, K.G, 229-1006 Sibeomdanji Woosung Apt. 16 Seohyun 1-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-050 / KR | 02 /
Ko, Jung-Wan, 315-401 Cheongmyeong Maeul 3-danji Daewoo Apt., 956-2, Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-737 / KR | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Rooney, John-Paul, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2005/50] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04721032.3 | 16.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004KR00555 | Priority number, date | US20030454618P | 17.03.2003 Original published format: US 454618 P | KR20030016496 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003016496 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004084201 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604358 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
G11B19/122 (EP);
G11B27/322 (EP);
G11B7/00736 (EP);
G11B20/1217 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSSPEICHERMEDIUM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFZEICHNEN UND/ODER WIEDERGEBEN VON DATEN DARAUF | [2005/50] | English: | INFORMATION STORAGE MEDIUM AND METHOD OF RECORDING AND/OR REPRODUCING DATA THEREON | [2005/50] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT ET/OU DE REPRODUCTION DE DONNEES SUR CELUI-CI | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02086887 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) | International search | [A]JPH05325393 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH10241267 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH10269855 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]US6005837 (BRUEKERS ALPHONS A M L [NL]); | [A]KR20010011557 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]JP2003068012 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [AP]WO03067581 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) |