EP1604273 - A PRINTING AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zamtec Limited 61/62 Fitzwilliam Lane Dublin 2 / IE | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Zamtec Limited 8 Fitzwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd, 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 02 /
LAPSTUN, Paul Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd, 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2005/50] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 11 Mespil Road IRL-Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 04721085.1 | 17.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004AU00317 | Priority number, date | AU20030901297 | 20.03.2003 Original published format: AU 2003901297 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004084060 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604273 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, B41J3/44, G06F3/12, G06F3/147, G06K15/02 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B41J2/14427 (EP,US);
G06F3/00 (KR);
B41J2/01 (EP,US);
B41J3/28 (EP,US);
B41J3/445 (EP,US);
G03G15/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | G06F3/147, G06F3/12, G06K15/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCK- UND ANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG | [2005/50] | English: | A PRINTING AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2005/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION ET D'AFFICHAGE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2012 | 31.03.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2001130090 (OKI DATA KK) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * [Y] 2 [I] 7,10; | [XI]US6315470 (VAGHI NINO [US]) [X] 1,3-4 * column 3, line 18 - line 22 * * column 4, line 65 - line 67 * * column 9, line 6 - line 26 * * column 9, line 40 - line 63 * * column 10, line 62 - column 12, line 9; figures 11,12,21,22 * [I] 5,7,10; | [Y]US2003020784 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0005] ** paragraph [0438] - paragraph [0439] * | International search | [A]US5752049 (LEE DONG-HO [KR]); | [A]DE10050805 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]); | [X]US6474882 (VAGHI NINO [US]) |