EP1621529 - 3-AMINO-3-ARYLPROPIONIC ACID n-ALKYL ESTERS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF OPTICALLY ACTIVE 3-AMINO-3-ARYLPROPIONIC ACIDS AND ESTERS OF THE ANTIPODES THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken 755-8633 / JP | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Yasuhito c/o Ube Research Laboratory 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi, Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 02 /
MIYATA, Hiroyuki c/o Ube Research Laboratory 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi, Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 03 /
KONEGAWA, Tadayoshi c/o Ube Research Laboratory 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi, Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 04 /
SAKATA, Kazuma c/o Ube Research Laboratory 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi, Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04721361.6 | 17.03.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004JP03543 | Priority number, date | JP20030071458 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003071458 | JP20030071459 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003071459 | [2006/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004083163 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621529 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/34, C07C227/18, C07B61/00, C12P13/00, C12P13/04 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
C12P41/005 (EP,US);
C07C229/34 (EP,US);
C07D317/60 (EP,US);
C12P13/04 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | C07C229/34, C07C227/18, C07B61/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 3-AMINO-3-ARYLPROPIONSÄURE-N-ALKYLESTER, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OPTISCH AKTIVEN 3-AMINO-3-ARYLPROPIONSÄUREN UND ESTERN DER ENANTIOMERE DAVON | [2006/05] | English: | 3-AMINO-3-ARYLPROPIONIC ACID n-ALKYL ESTERS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF OPTICALLY ACTIVE 3-AMINO-3-ARYLPROPIONIC ACIDS AND ESTERS OF THE ANTIPODES THERETO | [2006/05] | French: | ESTERS N-ALKYLIQUES D'ACIDE 3-AMINO-3-ARYLPROPIONIQUE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDES 3-AMINO-3-ARYLPROPRIONIQUES OPTIQUEMENT ACTIFS ET LEURS ESTERS AUX ANTIPODES DE CEUX-CI | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2005 | Translation filed | 07.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 20.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO9501348 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al); | [AP]JP2003325195 (DEGUSSA); | [A] - FAULCONBRIDGE S.J. ET AL, "Preparation of enantiomerically enriched aromatic beta-amino acids via enzymatic resolution", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2000), vol. 41, no. 15, pages 2679 - 2681, XP004194578 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)00222-7 |