EP1605807 - DEVICE FOR DISPENSING AT LEAST ONE WATER-SOLUBLE ACTIVE SUBSTANCE ONTO A CLEANING BRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2005/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSCHUK, Theo Heinrich-Könn-Str. 36 40625 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
MÜHLHAUSEN, Hans-Georg Schimmelpfennigstr. 61 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
KURANDT, Daniela Am Wehrhahn 57 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
MENKE, Ronald Nietzschestr. 9 40822 Mettmann / DE | 05 /
PRAUS, Gerd Alte Neusser Str. 42c 47807 Krefeld / DE | [2005/51] | Application number, filing date | 04721489.5 | 18.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004EP02794 | Priority number, date | DE2003113777 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10313777 | [2005/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004084697 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1605807 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1605807 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47K11/10 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A47K11/10 (EP);
A46B11/0006 (EP);
C11D1/86 (EP);
A46B2200/304 (EP);
C11D1/146 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE WENIGSTENS EINER WASSERLÖSLICHEN WIRKSUBSTANZ AN EINE REINIGUNGSBÜRSTE | [2005/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPENSING AT LEAST ONE WATER-SOLUBLE ACTIVE SUBSTANCE ONTO A CLEANING BRUSH | [2005/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DELIVRANT AU MOINS UNE SUBSTANCE SOLUBLE DANS L'EAU A UNE BROSSE DE NETTOYAGE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 24.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.10.2006 | CZ | 11.10.2006 | EE | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | FR | 11.10.2006 | GB | 11.10.2006 | IE | 11.10.2006 | IT | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | PL | 11.10.2006 | RO | 11.10.2006 | SI | 11.10.2006 | SK | 11.10.2006 | TR | 11.10.2006 | BG | 11.01.2007 | DK | 11.01.2007 | SE | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | ES | 22.01.2007 | AT | 18.03.2007 | LU | 18.03.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | HU | 12.04.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 11.10.2006 | |
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
FR | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2007 | ||
LU | 18.03.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
HU | 12.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
FR | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
GB | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IE | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 11.10.2006 | |
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
PL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 11.10.2006 | |
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/15] | SI | 11.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19820981 (AHRENS GEB REULEKE [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,7* figure 5 *; | [X]EP1087067 (BUCK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]FR2827753 (SCHLEE SERGE [FR]) [X] 1-4,8 * page 6, line 3 - line 19; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0167085 | EP0268967 | EP0791047 | WO0209567 | DE10026522 |