EP1611573 - OPTICAL RECORD CARRIER AND OPTICAL SCANNING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OPHEY, Willem, G. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/01] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04722620.4 | 23.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004IB50315 | Priority number, date | EP20030100817 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03100817 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004086388 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611573 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135, G11B7/24, G02B21/00, G02B27/58 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/135 (KR);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/004 (KR);
G11B7/1353 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER DATENTRÄGER UND OPTISCHE ABTASTVORRICHTUNG | [2006/01] | English: | OPTICAL RECORD CARRIER AND OPTICAL SCANNING DEVICE | [2006/01] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE OPTIQUE | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 21.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4242579 (BOUWHUIS GIJSBERTUS [NL]) [DA] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]EP0110730 (COMTECH RES UNIT [BM]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * page 1, line 35 - page 5, line 5; figures 5-8 * * page 8, line 3 - page 12, line 11 *; | [X]WO9858370 (DIGITAL PAPYRUS CORP [US]) [X] 10-14 * page 4, lines 2-29; figures 3,5 * * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 12 * * page 8, lines 15-19 *; | [X]WO9926240 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-13 * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 2; figures 6,7 * * page 14, line 4 - page 18, line 7; figures 14,17 * * page 20, line 27 - page 21, line 20; figures 27-28C *; | [X]US2001028620 (GUERRA JOHN M [US]) [X] 1-7,9 * paragraphs [0069] - [0073] - [0076] , [0077]; figures 15,21,22 * |