EP1608164 - DATA ENCODING APPARATUS, DATA ENCODING METHOD, DATA OUTPUT APPARATUS, DATA OUTPUT METHOD, SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM, SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS, SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD, DATA DECODING APPARATUS, AND DATA DECODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo, Tetsujiro, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Melzer, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04722714.5 | 23.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004JP03990 | Priority number, date | JP20030081469 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003081469 | JP20030081471 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003081471 | JP20030095948 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003095948 | JP20030129340 | 07.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003129340 | [2005/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004086758 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1608164 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/91, H04N7/24, G11B20/10 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
G11B20/10194 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00818 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (KR);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/26] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DATENCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, DATENAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG, DATENAUSGABEVERFAHREN, SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, DATENDECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DATENDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/51] | English: | DATA ENCODING APPARATUS, DATA ENCODING METHOD, DATA OUTPUT APPARATUS, DATA OUTPUT METHOD, SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM, SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS, SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD, DATA DECODING APPARATUS, AND DATA DECODING METHOD | [2005/51] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE CODAGE DE DONNEES, APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE SORTIE DE DONNEES, SYSTEME, APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX ET APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DECODAGE DE DONNEES | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2005 | Translation filed | 21.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 01.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10191247 (SONY CORP); | [X]JPH10289522 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [X]JP2002163866 (SONY CORP) |