EP1608006 - FILM FORMATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | For all designated states Renesas Technology Corp. Nippon Bldg 2-6-2, Ote-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | For all designated states HORIBA, LTD. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | ||
For all designated states Renesas Technology Corp. Nippon Bldg 2-6-2, Ote-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
For all designated states HORIBA, LTD. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | |||
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | ||
For all designated states Renesas Technology Corp. 4-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6334 / JP | |||
For all designated states HORIBA, LTD. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | |||
For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAMOTO, K., c/o Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Mizosaki-cho, Saiin, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158585 / JP | 02 /
NABATAME, T., c/o Renesas Technology Corp. I.P. Div., 4-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1006334 / JP | 03 /
TOMINAGA, K., c/o Horiba, Ltd. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6018510 / JP | 04 /
YASUDA, T., Nat. Inst.of Ad. Ind. Science & Tech. Tsukuba Central 4, 1-1 Higashi 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8562 / JP | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04722958.8 | 24.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004JP04076 | Priority number, date | JP20030083692 | 25.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003083692 | [2005/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004086481 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1608006 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/31 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
C23C16/45527 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
H01L21/0228 (EP,US);
C23C16/45529 (EP,US);
C23C16/56 (EP,US);
H01L21/02337 (US);
H01L21/3141 (US);
H01L21/02175 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02178 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02181 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02183 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02189 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02197 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/3143 (US);
H01L21/31616 (US);
H01L21/31637 (US);
H01L21/31641 (US);
H01L21/31645 (US);
H01L21/31691 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FI, FR [2006/26] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILMERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2005/51] | English: | FILM FORMATION APPARATUS | [2005/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION DE FILM | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2005 | Translation filed | 26.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 07.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2181458 (EPSILON LTD PARTNERSHIP) [A] 1-11* figures 1-4; claims 12-19 *; | [A]US2002153579 (YAMAMOTO ICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0109] - [0113]; figure 8 *; | [A]US6500742 (CHERN CHYI [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2003031793 (CHANG JANE P [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0043] - [0060]; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JPH08288283 (RICOH KK) |