EP1613746 - NOVEL PLANT ACYLTRANSFERASES SPECIFIC FOR LONG-CHAINED, MULTIPLY UNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL 3rd Floor, Senate House, Tyndall Avenue Bristol BS8 1TH / GB | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENZ, Andreas Heinrich-von-Kleist-Str. 6 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Jörg Friedrich-Profit-Str. 56 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
FRENTZEN, Margit Worringerweg 1 52072 Aachen / DE | 04 /
SÖZER, Nursen Klosterstr. 38a 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | 05 /
KEITH, Stobart 6 Julius Road Bishopston Bristol BS7 8EN / GB | 06 /
FRASER, Thomas 19 Pyecroft Ave, Henleaze Bristol BS9 4NL / GB | 07 /
LAZARUS, Colin, M. 119 York Road Montpelier Bristol BS6 5QG / GB | 08 /
QI, Baoxiu 4 Cumberland House Norfolk Crescent Bath BAI 2BG / GB | 09 /
ABBADI, Amine Lübbersmeyer Weg 26 22549 Hamburg / DE | 10 /
HEINZ, Ernst Puttkampsweg 13 22609 Hamburg / DE | [2013/10] |
Former [2006/02] | 01 /
RENZ, Andreas Heinrich-von-Kleist-Str. 6 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | ||
02 /
BAUER, Jörg Friedrich-Profit-Str. 56 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03 /
FRENTZEN, Margit Worringerweg 1 52072 Aachen / DE | |||
04 /
SÖZER, Nursen Klosterstr. 38a 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | |||
05 /
KEITH, Stobart 6 Julius Road, Bishopston Bristol BS7 8EN / GB | |||
06 /
FRASER, Thomas 19 Pyecroft Ave, Henleaze Bristol BS9 4NL / GB | |||
07 /
LAZARUS, Colin, M. 119 York Road, Montpelier Bristol BS6 5QG / GB | |||
08 /
QI, Baoxiu 4 Cumberland House, Norfolk Crescent Bath BAI 2BG / GB | |||
09 /
ABBADI, Amine Lübbersmeyer Weg 26 22549 Hamburg / DE | |||
10 /
HEINZ, Ernst Puttkampsweg 13 22609 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Pressler, Uwe BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2013/10] |
Former [2006/02] | Pressler, Uwe c/o BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04723591.6 | 26.03.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004EP03224 | Priority number, date | DE2003114759 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10314759 | DE2003148996 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10348996 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004087902 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1613746 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613746 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12N15/82, C12P7/64, A01H5/00 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
C12P7/6427 (EP,US);
C12N15/8247 (EP,US);
C12N9/1029 (EP,US);
C12P7/6432 (US);
C12P7/6434 (US);
C12P7/6458 (US);
C12P7/6472 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Title | German: | NEUE PFLANZLICHE ACYLTRANSFERASEN SPEZIFISCH FÜR LANGKETTIGE, MEHRFACH UNGESÄTTIGTE FETTSÄUREN | [2006/02] | English: | NOVEL PLANT ACYLTRANSFERASES SPECIFIC FOR LONG-CHAINED, MULTIPLY UNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS | [2006/02] | French: | NOUVELLES ACYLTRANSFERASES VEGETALES SPECIFIQUES POUR ACIDES GRAS A LONGUE CHAINE POLYINSATURES | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.08.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11156830.9 / EP2365063 | EP11156834.1 / EP2390313 | EP16165842.2 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2004 | CY | 06.03.2013 | CZ | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | IT | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | PL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | AT | 26.03.2013 | IE | 26.03.2013 | LU | 26.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
TR | 06.03.2013 | ||
AT | 26.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
AT | 26.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BG | 06.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DXA]WO0018889 (CALGENE LLC [US]) [DX] 11,15-23 * sequence 6 * [A] 1-26; | [X]WO0159128 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 24-26 * page 10, line 13 - line 27; table 1 * * page 69, line 15 - page 70, line 46; example - *; | [X]WO02072742 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [X] 24-26 * the whole document *; | [X] - LOPEZ ALONSO D ET AL, "Plants as 'chemical factories' for the production of polyunsaturated fatty acids", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, (200010), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0734-9750, pages 481 - 497, XP002208312 [X] 24-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0734-9750(00)00048-3 | [DA] - KNUTZON D S ET AL, "CLONING OF A COCONUT ENDOSPERM CDNA ENCODING A 1-ACYL-SN-GLYCEROL-3-PHOSPHATE ACYLTRANSFERASE THAT ACCEPTS MEDIUM-CHAIN-LENGHT SUBSTRATES", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (1995), vol. 109, no. 3, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 999 - 1006, XP000907268 [DA] 1-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.109.3.999 | [A] - LASSNER M W ET AL, "LYSOPHOSPHATIDIC ACID ACYLTRANSFERASE FROM MEADOWFOAM MEDIATES INSERTION OF ERUCIC ACID AT THE SN-2 POSITION OF TRIACYLGLYCEROL IN TRANSGENIC RAPESEED OIL", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (1995), vol. 109, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1389 - 1394, XP002003604 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.109.4.1389 | [A] - HOBBS D H ET AL, "Cloning of a cDNA encoding diacylglycerol acyltransferase from Arabidopsis thaliana and its functional expression", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990611), vol. 452, no. 3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 145 - 149, XP004259739 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(99)00646-8 | [A] - LIU ET AL., "Cloning and Sequencing of the cDNA (Accession No. AF090734) Coding for Glycerol-3-Phosphate Acyltransferase from Vicia faba. (PGR99-094)", EMBL, (19980923), Database accession no. AF090734, URL: EBI, XP002295954 [A] 1-26 * column A * | [A] - JAKO C ET AL, "Seed-specific over-expression of an Arabidopsis cDNA encoding a diacylglycerol acyltransferase enhances seed oil content and seed weight", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (200106), vol. 126, no. 2, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 861 - 874, XP002242963 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.126.2.861 | [A] - ZOU ET AL, "The Arabidopsis thaliana TAG1 mutant has a mutation in a diacylglycerol acyltransferase gene", PLANT JOURNAL, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (1999), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 645 - 653, XP002133607 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313x.1999.00555.x | [A] - MCLEAN J ET AL, "CLONING AND EXPRESSION OF HUMAN LECITHIN-CHOLESTEROL ACYLTRANSFERASE CDNA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19860401), vol. 83, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2335 - 2339, XP002008904 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.83.8.2335 | [A] - OELKERS PETER ET AL, "A lecithin cholesterol acyltransferase-like gene mediates diacylglycerol esterification in yeast", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000526), vol. 275, no. 21, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 15609 - 15612, XP002295953 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.C000144200 |