EP1616689 - STRETCHED FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIJIMA, Shigetoshi, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
IMUTA, Shinichi, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
HIROSE, Toshiyuki, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2006/03] | 01 /
NISHIJIMA, Shigetoshi, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | ||
02 /
IMUTA, Shinichi, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
03 /
HIROSE, Toshiyuki, Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | Representative(s) | Simons, Amanda Louise J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/19] |
Former [2006/03] | Simons, Amanda Louise J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04723740.9 | 26.03.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004JP04290 | Priority number, date | JP20030092796 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003092796 | [2006/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004087401 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616689 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616689 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C55/02, B32B27/32, C08J5/18 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29C33/68 (EP,US);
B29C55/16 (KR);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
H05K3/4611 (EP,US);
B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
C08J2323/02 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/27] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GEDEHNTE FOLIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/03] | English: | STRETCHED FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2006/03] | French: | FILM ETIRE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2005 | Translation filed | 28.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 10.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60178031 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 4* abstract *; | [A]EP0219198 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]EP0336704 (DU PONT CANADA [CA]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 6; example 1 *; | [A]EP0376681 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-4 * example 1 *; | [A]WO9834784 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 4, line 11 - line 25 *; | [A]WO0018555 (AIRTECH INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 13, line 9 - line 18 *; | [XDA]EP1264685 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [XD] 1-3 * paragraphs [0012] , [0027] , [0029] , [0039]; tables 1-3 * [A] 4 | International search | [A]JPS60206620 (HONSHU PAPER CO LTD); | [A]JPH09234786 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2001009890 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2002192673 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]JP2002225207 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) |