EP1608681 - RGD-ENRICHED GELATINE-LIKE PROTEINS WITH ENHANCED CELL BINDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Manufacturing Europe B.V. Oudenstaart 1 5047 TK Tilburg / NL | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Fuji Film Manufacturing Europe B.V. Oudenstaart 1 5047 TK Tilburg / NL | ||
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film B.V. Oudenstraat 1 5047 TK Tilburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUWSTRA, Jan, Bastiaan Soestdijkseweg Z 202 NL-3721 AJ Bilthoven / NL | 02 /
VAN ES, Andries, Johannes, Jozef Dennenlaan 66 NL-4849 BE Dorst / NL | 03 /
TODA, Yuzo 351-0024, Asaka-Shi Senzui, 3-1-17-1104 3-1-17-1104 / JP | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04723872.0 | 26.03.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004NL00208 | Priority number, date | EP20030075906 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03075906 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004085473 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1608681 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1608681 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/78, C12N5/00 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/5078 (EP,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,US);
A61K9/1658 (EP,US);
A61L27/222 (EP);
A61L31/045 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
C12N5/0075 (EP,US);
C12N2533/30 (EP,US);
C12N2533/54 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RGD-ANGEREICHERTE GELATINE-ÄHNLICHE PROTEINE MIT VERSTÄRKTER ZELLBINDUNG | [2005/52] | English: | RGD-ENRICHED GELATINE-LIKE PROTEINS WITH ENHANCED CELL BINDING | [2005/52] | French: | PROTEINES DE TYPE ENRICHI DE RGD (ARGININE-GLYCINE-ACIDE ASPARTIQUE) A LIAISON CELLULAIRE AMELIOREE | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07111303.9 / EP1894945 | EP07111314.6 / EP1845107 | EP07111323.7 / EP1918301 | EP07111329.4 / EP1875924 | EP07111368.2 / EP1862476 | EP09167888.8 / EP2112163 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2008 | BE | 04.06.2008 | CY | 04.06.2008 | CZ | 04.06.2008 | DK | 04.06.2008 | EE | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | IT | 04.06.2008 | PL | 04.06.2008 | RO | 04.06.2008 | SI | 04.06.2008 | SK | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | BG | 04.09.2008 | SE | 04.09.2008 | GR | 05.09.2008 | ES | 15.09.2008 | PT | 04.11.2008 | HU | 05.12.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
HU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 04.06.2008 | |
ES | 15.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO9818918 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [I] 1-9,15 * page 4, line 35 - page 6, line 15 * * page 25, line 22 - line 30 *; | [X]US6140072 (FERRARI FRANCO A [US], et al) [X] 1-9,15 * SEQ ID NO:66; column 36, line 1 - column 41, line 52 *; | [A]WO02064625 (ADP PHARMACEUTICAL PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-11,14,15 * SEQ ID NO:22; page 73, line 12 - line 22 *; | [A] - WIERZBA A ET AL., "PRODUCTION AND PROPERTIES OF A BIFUNCTIONAL FUSION PROTEIN THAT MEDIATES ATTACHMENT OF VERO CELLS TO CELLULOSIC MATRICES", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING. INCLUDING: SYMPOSIUM BIOTECHNOLOGY IN ENERGY PRODUCTION AND CONSERVATION, JOHN WILEY & SONS. NEW YORK, US, (19950720), vol. 47, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 147 - 154, XP002023829 [A] 1-11,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260470205 |