EP1609473 - USE OF ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMINE IN TREATMENT OF LOCAL LESIONS AND SYSTEMATIC SYMPTOMS RELATED TO INFECTIONS OF VIRUS OR BACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Third Military Medical University Chinese People's Liberation Army P.R. of China No. 30-Gaotanyan Street, Shapingba District Chongqing 400038 / CN | For all designated states Bio-Wave Institute of Suzhou Hi-Tech New District Corporation, Ltd 5F No. 125-Binghe Street, New District of Suzhou Jiangsu 215011 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Sino-Hongkong Dafu Science & Technology of Biowave Co., Ltd. Room 102, Xiaoyuyang Hotel, North of Erhuan Road, Pinggu Town, Pinggu District Beijing 101200 / CN | [2006/20] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Third Military Medical University Chinese People's Liberation Army P.R. of China No. 30-Gaotanyan Street, Shapingba District Chongqing 400038 / CN | ||
For all designated states Bio-Wave Institute of Suzhou Hi-Tech New District Corporation, Ltd 5F No. 125-Binghe Street, New District of Suzhou Jiangsu 215011 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Qiwang, No. 30 Gaotanyan Street Shapingba District Chongqing 400038 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Junkang, No. 30 Gaotanyan Street Shapingba District Chongqing 400038 / CN | 03 /
YUAN, Zetao, NO. 30 Gaotanyan Street Shapingba District Chongqing 400038 / CN | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Neunert, Peter Andreas Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Neunert, Peter Andreas Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04723953.8 | 29.03.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004CN00281 | Priority number, date | CN2003108280 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: CN 03108280 | [2005/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004084916 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1609473 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1609473 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7008, A61P31/00, A61P39/00 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/7008 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMIN BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON LOKALEN LÄSIONEN UND SYSTEMATISCHEN SYMPTOMEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT VIRALEN ODER BAKTERIELLEN INFEKTIONEN | [2005/52] | English: | USE OF ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMINE IN TREATMENT OF LOCAL LESIONS AND SYSTEMATIC SYMPTOMS RELATED TO INFECTIONS OF VIRUS OR BACTERIA | [2005/52] | French: | UTILISATION DE N-ACETYLE-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMINE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LESIONS LOCALES ET DE SYMPTOMES SYSTEMATIQUES LIES AUX INFECTIONS VIRALES OU BACTERIENNES | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2005 | Translation filed | 13.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 13.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9535112 (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * claims 1,2,5 *; | [X]US6037333 (PANJWANI NOORJAHAN A [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 33 *; | [PX]WO2004014398 (UNIV PLA 3RD MILITARY MEDICAL [CN], et al) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [T]EP1535620 (UNIV PLA 3RD MILITARY MEDICAL [CN], et al) [T] * paragraphs [0020] - [0022]; claims 1-5 *; | [X] - VISHNYAKOVA L A ET AL, "Method of prophylaxis of experimental pneumococcal infection", ZHURNAL MIKROBIOLOGII EPIDEMIOLOGII I IMMUNOBIOLOGII, (1997), vol. 0, no. 2, ISSN 0372-9311, pages 20 - 23, XP009082563 [X] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4772591 (MEISNER LORRAINE F [US]); | [A]EP0372730 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA]); | [A]WO9008549 (SPECK ULRICH [DE]); | [A]US5217962 (BURTON ALBERT F [CA], et al); | [A]CN1372931 (MILITARY MEDICAL UNIV NO 3 P L [CN]) | by applicant | US6037333 | WO9535112 | WO2004014398 | - VISHNYAKOVA, L.A. ET AL., "Method of prophylaxis of experimental pneumococcal infection", ZHURNAL MIKROBIOLOGII EPIDEMIOLOGII I IMMUNOBIOLOGII, (1997), vol. 0, no. 2, pages 20 - 23 |