EP1611896 - USE OF N-ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMINE IN TREATMENT OF HYPERTHYROIDISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/01] | USE OF N-ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMINE IN TREATMENT OF LOCAL LESIONS OR SYSTEMATIC SYMPTOMS RELATED TO AUTOIMMUNE REACTIONS | ||
[2010/36] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Third Military Medical University Chinese People's Liberation Army P.R. of China No. 30-Gaotanyan Street, Shapingba District Chongqing 400038 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Sino-Hongkong Dafu Science & Technology of Biowave Co., Ltd. Room 102, Xiaoyuyang Hotel, North of Erhuan Road, Pinggu Town, Pinggu District Beijing 101200 / CN | For all designated states Bio-Wave Institute of Suzhou Hi-Tech New District Corporation, Ltd 5F No. 125-Binghe Street, New District of Suzhou Jiangsu 215011 / CN | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Qiwang N0. 30 Gaotanyan Street, Shapingba District Chongqing 400038 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Junkang N0. 30 Gaotanyan Street, Shapingba District Chongqing 400038 / CN | 03 /
YUAN, Zetao NO. 30 Gaotanyan Street, Shapingba District Chongqing 400038 / CN | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L., Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 04723965.2 | 29.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004CN00275 | Priority number, date | CN20031008277 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: CN 03108277 | [2006/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004084913 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611896 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61P5/14, A61K31/7008 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/7008 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/01] | A61K31/7008, A61P37/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON N-ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMIN BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERTHYREOSE | [2010/36] | English: | USE OF N-ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMINE IN TREATMENT OF HYPERTHYROIDISM | [2010/36] | French: | UTILISATION DE N-ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERTHYROÏDIE | [2010/36] |
Former [2006/01] | VERWENDUNG VON N-ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMIN BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON LOKALEN LÄSIONEN ODER SYSTEMATISCHEN SYMPTOMEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT AUTOIMMUNREAKTIONEN | ||
Former [2006/01] | USE OF N-ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMINE IN TREATMENT OF LOCAL LESIONS OR SYSTEMATIC SYMPTOMS RELATED TO AUTOIMMUNE REACTIONS | ||
Former [2006/01] | UTILISATION DE N-ACETYL-D-AMINOGLYCOSAMINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LESIONS LOCALES OU DE SYMPTOMES SYSTEMATIQUES ASSOCIES A DES REACTIONS AUTO-IMMUNES | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2005 | Translation filed | 26.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/19] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0379753 (SPECK ULRICH) [Y] 4,7 * column 5, paragraph 1 *; | [XY]WO03002117 (ASTION DEV AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * examples 87,100,125 * * claims 1,4,5,39,40,47,70,71 * * page 34, line 30 * [Y] 4,7; | [XY]WO03002125 (ASTION AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * examples 45,87,88,273 * * claims 1,3,7,32,34,40,63,64 * [Y] 4,7; | [L] - MANNA R ET AL, "Psoriasis: an autoimmune disease", MINERVA MEDICA 1992 ITALY, (1992), vol. 83, no. 7-8, ISSN 0026-4806, pages 403 - 414, XP009085634 [L] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP0372730 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA]); | [X]US5217962 (BURTON ALBERT F [CA], et al) |