EP1612796 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2012/24] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINKAI, Mitsutoshi SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 1410001 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Takayoshi SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 1410001 / JP | [2012/24] |
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
SHINKAI, Mitsutoshi SONY CORPORATION, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 1410001 / JP | ||
02 /
KAWAMURA, Takayoshi SONY CORPORATION, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 1410001 / JP | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04724868.7 | 31.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004JP04706 | Priority number, date | JP20030101842 | 04.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003101842 | [2006/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004090902 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612796 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612796 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/031, G11B27/10, G11B27/30, // G11B27/034, G11B27/32 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/3036 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2525 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2537 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/01] | G11B27/034, G11B27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/28] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2006/01] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2006/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT, PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2004 | Translation filed | 15.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0989756 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [X] 1-8,12-14 * abstract * * column 8, line 21 - line 29 * * figures 2a,2b * [Y] 9-11; | [A]US6151443 (GABLE MELVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - line 32 * * column 6, line 15 - line 30 ** column 7, line 8 - line 42 *; | [X]US2001052050 (HIROSE MASAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] - [0079] - [0085]; figures 6,7a *; | [XY]US2003026592 (KAWAHARA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 3,10 * * paragraphs [0099] , [0209] , [0210] * [Y] 9; | [A]JP2003092723 (CANON KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 9,10,14 *; | [YT] - SPLICE POINTS FOR MPEG-2 TRANSPORT STREAMS, SMPTE JOURNAL, SMPTE INC. SCARSDALE, N.Y, US, PAGE(S) 916-925, (199810), ISSN 0036-1682, XP000793004 [Y] 9-11 * abstract * [T] 1-14 | [Y] - JIM WILKINSON ET AL, "SMPTE Unique Material Identifier (UMID) & Application", VIDEO STANDARDS AND DRAFTS, XX, XX, (19990702), no. M4768, XP030033988 [Y] 9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.1] , [0003] , [0006]; figures 2,3 * | International search | [Y]JPH06233226 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JPH08221955 (SONY CORP); | [Y]WO9940586 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2001351365 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2002271395 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2003092723 (CANON KK) |