EP1610901 - SPRAY ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atrium Innovation Limited Rowlandson House 289-293 Ballards Lane London N12 8NP / GB | [2009/50] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Aerstream Technology Limited Mulberry House, Osborne Road Wokingham RG40 1TL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIRRIE, Alastair, Bruce 91 Plantation Road Oxford OX2 6JE / GB | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04725087.3 | 01.04.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004GB01431 | Priority number, date | GB20030008021 | 07.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0308021 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004089552 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610901 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1610901 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/025 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B05B5/0255 (EP,US);
B05B5/025 (US);
B05B12/06 (EP,US);
B05B15/55 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | 25.10.2005 | HR | 25.10.2005 | LT | 25.10.2005 | LV | 25.10.2005 | MK | 25.10.2005 | Title | German: | SPRÜHELEKTRODE | [2006/01] | English: | SPRAY ELECTRODE | [2006/01] | French: | ELECTRODE DE PULVERISATION | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.03.2009 | BE | 04.03.2009 | CY | 04.03.2009 | CZ | 04.03.2009 | DK | 04.03.2009 | EE | 04.03.2009 | FI | 04.03.2009 | IT | 04.03.2009 | NL | 04.03.2009 | PL | 04.03.2009 | RO | 04.03.2009 | SI | 04.03.2009 | SK | 04.03.2009 | TR | 04.03.2009 | IE | 01.04.2009 | LU | 01.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | BG | 04.06.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | GR | 05.06.2009 | ES | 15.06.2009 | PT | 18.08.2009 | HU | 05.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
LU | 01.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
HU | 05.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
LU | 01.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 04.03.2009 | |
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 04.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0486198 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 14,15 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 2 * * column 9, line 17 - line 24; figure - *; | [X]US5511726 (GREENSPAN BERNARD J [US], et al) [X] 16,18-21 * column 6, line 10 - line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]US5572023 (CAPRIOLI RICHARD M [US]) [A] 14,15 * column 5, line 29 - line 40 * * column 6, line 37, paragraph 56 *; | [XAI]EP0853980 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * column 9, line 30 - line 46 * * column 10, line 19 - line 42; figure - * [A] 3-7 [I] 8-11; | [XA]US5935331 (NAKA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 16,17,20-23 * column 19, line 1 - line 11; figure 15 * [A] 18,19; | [X]US6318640 (COFFEE RONALD ALAN [GB]) [X] 16,17,20-23* the whole document *; | [XI]US2002149313 (YONEKURA SEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,12,13 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0075] * * figures 1,2,12 * [I] 8-11; | [X]US2002158196 (BERGGREN WILLIAM TRAVIS [US], et al) [X] 16,17,20-23 * the whole document *; | [XPA]US2004011954 (PARK MELVIN A [US]) [XP] 1,2,4,8,12,13 * paragraph [0074]; figures 11A-C * [AP] 14,15 | by applicant | US5961298 | WO03000431 | - CLOUPEAU AND PRUNET-ROCH, J. ELECTROSTATICS, (1989), no. 22, pages 135 - 159 | - JAWOREK & KRUPA, J. AEROSOL SCI., (1996), no. 7, pages 979 - 986 |