EP1617218 - METHOD OF SCREENING DRUG WITH THE USE OF 67 kDa LAMININ RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/03] | METHOD OF SCREENING DRUG WITH THE USE OF 67 kDa LAMININ RECEPTOR AND DRUG OBTAINED THEREBY | ||
[2010/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyushu TLO Company, Limited 10-1, Hakozaki 6-chome, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8581 / JP | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TACHIBANA, Hirofumi 7-8, Kashiihama 4-chome, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 8130016 / JP | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, P.O. Box 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04725184.8 | 01.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004JP04772 | Priority number, date | JP20030097652 | 01.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003097652 | [2006/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004090541 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617218 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1617218 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, A61K31/353 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/7055 (EP,US);
G01N33/53 (KR);
A61K31/353 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/00 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
G01N33/50 (KR);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
G01N2333/7055 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/03] | G01N33/53, G01N33/50, G01N33/15, A61K45/00, A61K31/353, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, A61P25/00, A61P25/28, A61P35/00, A61P37/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENING EINES ARZNEISTOFFS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES 67 kDa GROSSEN LAMININREZEPTORS | [2010/39] | English: | METHOD OF SCREENING DRUG WITH THE USE OF 67 kDa LAMININ RECEPTOR | [2010/39] | French: | METHODE DE CRIBLAGE DE MEDICAMENT AU MOYEN DU RECEPTEUR DE LAMININE 67 kDa | [2010/39] |
Former [2006/03] | VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENING EINES ARZNEISTOFFS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES 67 kDa GROSSEN LAMININREZEPTORS UND DAMIT ERHALTENER ARZNEISTOFF | ||
Former [2006/03] | METHOD OF SCREENING DRUG WITH THE USE OF 67 kDa LAMININ RECEPTOR AND DRUG OBTAINED THEREBY | ||
Former [2006/03] | METHODE DE CRIBLAGE DE MEDICAMENT AU MOYEN DU RECEPTEUR DE LAMININE 67 kDa ET MEDICAMENT AINSI OBTENU | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2005 | Translation filed | 26.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.06.2010 | 07.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | PL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | IE | 01.04.2011 | LU | 01.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2011 | ||
LU | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2011 | ||
LU | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 23.02.2011 | |
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6410052 (MORRE DOROTHY M [US], et al) [X] 4-6,25-30* Column 1: 2.1 ; Column 14: 5.1 and claims *; | [T] - HOU Z ET AL, "Effects of tea polyphenols on signal transduction pathways related to cancer chemoprevention", MUTATION RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041102), vol. 555, no. 1-2, ISSN 0027-5107, pages 3 - 19, XP004598056 [T] 1-30 * Item 10, first paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mrfmmm.2004.06.040 | [X] - NARUMI K ET AL, "Inhibition of experimental metastasis of human fibrosarcoma cells by anti-recombinant 37-kDa laminin binding protein antibody", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH, JAPANESE CANCER ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (199904), vol. 90, no. 4, ISSN 0910-5050, pages 425 - 431, XP002347726 [X] 1,2 * Discussion on pages 428-430 * | [A] - GEBAROWSKA DOROTA ET AL, "Synthetic peptides interacting with the 67-kd laminin receptor can reduce retinal ischemia and inhibit hypoxia-induced retinal neovascularization", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (200201), vol. 160, no. 1, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 307 - 313, XP002424191 [A] 1-30 * Page 308, right column, end of second paragraph; Discussion pages 311-312. * | [A] - TANAKA MASASHI ET AL, "Expression of the 37-kDa laminin binding protein in murine lung tumor cell correlates with tumor angiogenesis", CANCER LETTERS, (20000529), vol. 153, no. 1-2, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 161 - 168, XP002424192 [A] 1-30 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(00)00365-7 | [PX] - KOO ET AL, "Pharmacological effects of green tea on the gastrointestinal system", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041001), vol. 500, no. 1-3, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 177 - 185, XP005480414 [PX] 1,2,4-6,12-17,25,26 * Fig. 1, page 179: paragraph bridging right and left columns * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejphar.2004.07.023 | International search | [A]JPH06219965 (US GOVERNMENT [US]); | [A]JPH08205885 (JOLLA CANCER RES FOUND [US]); | [X]WO9954356 (UNIV BELFAST [GB], et al); | [X]JP2000226329 (MEIJI MILK PROD CO LTD, et al); | [X]JP2001114687 (MITSUI NORIN KK); | [X]JP2002220340 (ITO EN LTD); | [XP] - TACHIBANA H, ET AL, "A receptor for green tea polyphenol EGCG", NAT. STRUCT. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 380 - 381, XP002980515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nsmb743 | [ ] - PUBMED, Database accession no. 15024383 | by applicant | - T. H. LANDOWSKI, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 34, pages 11276 - 11287 | - S. BUTO, J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 69, pages 244 - 251 | - Y. SHI, CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (2002), vol. 59, pages 1577 - 1583 | - H. COGGIN, JR., ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 19, pages 5535 - 5542 | - BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, (1998), vol. 52, pages 137 - 145 | - S. MENARD ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 3, pages 227 - 231 | - G. FONTANINI ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 2, pages 1777 - 1780 | - F. BASOLO; V. COICE ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1991), vol. 83, pages 29 - 36 | - S. MENARD, BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, (1998), vol. 52, pages 137 - 145 | - K. SATOH, BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1999), vol. 80, pages 1115 - 1122 | - M. TANAKA, CANCER LETTERS, (2000), vol. 153, pages 161 - 168 | - K. NARUMI, JPN. J. CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 90, pages 425 - 431 | - D. GEBAROWSKA, AM. J. PATHOL., (2002), vol. 160, pages 307 - 313 | - T. GLOE, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 15996 - 16002 | - S. GAUCZYNSKI, EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, pages 5863 - 5875 | - S. M. CANFIELD, J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, pages 3430 - 3440 | - N. CLAUSSE, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1998), vol. 251, pages 564 - 569 | - A. BRADFIELD ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., (1947), vol. 32, page 2249 | - D. M. SMITH, INT. J. MOL. MED., (2001), vol. 7, pages 645 - 652 | - K. T. KAVANAGH, J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 82, pages 387 - 398 | - N. AHMAD, ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (2000), vol. 376, pages 338 - 346 | - M. SUSUKA, CANCER LETT., (1995), vol. 98, pages 27 - 31 | - M. ISEMURA, CELL BIOL. INT., (1993), vol. 17, pages 559 - 564 | - Y. SUZUKI, CANCER LETT., (2001), vol. 173, pages 15 - 20 | - S. PIANETTI, CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, pages 652 - 655 | - S. LAMY, CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, pages 381 - 385 | - A. SACHINIDIS, FASEB J., (2002), vol. 16, pages 893 - 895 | - Y. CAO, NATURE, (1999), vol. 389, page 381 | - S. HAYAKAWA, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2001), vol. 285, pages 1102 - 1106 | - M. E. WALTNER-LAW, J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 34933 - 34940 | - Y. LEVITES, J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 30574 - 30580 | - Y. FUJIMURA, J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2002), vol. 50, pages 5729 - 5734 | - S. AHMED, FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY & MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 33, pages 1097 - 2002 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 34, pages 11276 - 11287 | - J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 69, pages 244 - 251 | - CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (2002), vol. 59, pages 1577 - 1583 | - ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 19, pages 5535 - 5542 | - CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 3, pages 227 - 231 | - CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 2, pages 1777 - 1780 | - J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1991), vol. 83, pages 29 - 36 | - BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1999), vol. 80, pages 1115 - 1122 | - CANCER LETTERS, (2000), vol. 153, pages 161 - 168 | - JPN. J. CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 90, pages 425 - 431 | - AM. J. PATHOL., (2002), vol. 160, pages 307 - 313 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 15996 - 16002 | - EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, pages 5863 - 5875 | - J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, pages 3430 - 3440 | - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1998), vol. 251, pages 564 - 569 | - J. CHEM. SOC., (1947), vol. 32, page 2249 | - INT. J. MOL. MED., (2001), vol. 7, pages 645 - 652 | - J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 82, pages 387 - 398 | - ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (2000), vol. 376, pages 338 - 346 | - CANCER LETT., (1995), vol. 98, pages 27 - 31 | - CELL. BIOL. INT., (1993), vol. 17, pages 559 - 564 | - CANCER LETT., (2001), vol. 173, pages 15 - 20 | - CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, pages 652 - 655 | - CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, pages 381 - 385 | - FASEB J., (2002), vol. 16, pages 893 - 895 | - NATURE, (1999), vol. 389, page 381 | - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2001), vol. 285, pages 1102 - 1106 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 34933 - 34940 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 30574 - 30580 | - J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2002), vol. 50, pages 5729 - 5734 | - FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY & MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 33, pages 1097 - 2002 | - H. YOU, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, page 6394 | - YOW ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1988), vol. 85, pages 6394 - 6398 |