EP1616018 - METHOD OF PRODUCING 1,2-PROPANEDIOL USING KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/03] | METHOD OF PRODUCING 1,2-PROPANEDIOL USING i KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE /i | ||
[2015/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MC, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ CheilJedang Corporation 500, Namdaemunro 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul / KR | [2008/29] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states CJ Corp. 500, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-no, Chung-ku Seoul 100-095 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Young-Hoon 111-102 Mujigae Daerim Apt Gumidong Bundang-gu Seongnam-city, Kyungki-do 463-703 / KR | 02 /
CHUNG, Jin-Su 101-803 Byuksan Yeonwonmaeul Mabukri Guseong Yongin-city, Kyungki-do 449-912 / KR | 03 /
CHO, Kwang-Myung 707-1603 Hyundai Apt. 753 Ami-ri Bubal-eup Icheon-city, Kyungki-do 449-912 / KR | 04 /
KANG, Seong-Uk CJ building 500 Namdaemunro5ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-749 / KR | 05 /
UM, Hye-Won 101-1001 Jugong Greenvil Maetandong Youngtonggu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | [2016/01] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
PARK, Young-Hoon 111-102 Mujigae Daerim Apt, Gumidong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-city, Kyungki-do 463-703 / KR | ||
02 /
CHUNG, Jin-Su 101-803 Byuksan, Yeonwonmaeul, Mabukri, Guseong Yongin-city, Kyungki-do 449-912 / KR | |||
03 /
CHO, Kwang-Myung 707-1603 Hyundai Apt. 753 Ami-ri, Bubal-eup Icheon-city, Kyungki-do 449-912 / KR | |||
04 /
KANG, Seong-Uk CJ building 500 Namdaemunro5ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-749 / KR | |||
05 /
UM, Hye-Won 101-1001 Jugong Greenvil, Maetandong, Youngtonggu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | |||
Former [2006/03] | 01 /
PARK, Young-Hoon 111-102 Mujigae Daerim Apt, Gumidong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-city, Kyungki-do 463-703 / KR | ||
02 /
CHUNG, Jin-Su 101-803 Byuksan, Yeonwonmaeul, Mabukri, Guseong Yongin-city, Kyungki-do 449-912 / KR | |||
03 /
CHO, Kwang-Myung 707-1603 Hyundai Apt. 753 Ami-ri, Bubal-eup Icheon-city, Kyungki-do 449-912 / KR | |||
04 /
KANG, Seong-Uk 105-602 Hyundai Apt., Kimryangjang-dong Yongin-city, Kyungki-do 449-709 / KR | |||
05 /
UM, Hye-Won 101-1001 Jugong Greenvil, Maetandong, Youngtonggu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2006/03] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04725211.9 | 01.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004KR00759 | Priority number, date | KR20030020734 | 02.04.2003 Original published format: KR 2003020734 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004087936 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616018 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616018 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/18 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
C12P7/18 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S435/852 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,2-PROPANDIOL UNTER VERWENDUNG VON KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE | [2006/03] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING 1,2-PROPANEDIOL USING KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE | [2015/35] | French: | METHODE DE PRODUCTION DE 1,2-PROPANDIOL AU MOYEN DE KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE | [2015/35] |
Former [2006/03] | METHOD OF PRODUCING 1,2-PROPANEDIOL USING i KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE /i | ||
Former [2006/03] | METHODE DE PRODUCTION DE 1,2-PROPANDIOL AU MOYEN DE I KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE /I | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 24.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 11.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | IE | 01.04.2016 | LU | 01.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 01.04.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 01.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3336051 (MAIZENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * claim - *; | [A]WO9837204 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1-7* claim - *; | [A] - CAMERON D C ET AL, "A NOVEL FERMENTATION: THE PRODUCTION OF R(-)-1,2-PROPANEDIOL AND ACETOL BY CLOSTRIDIUM THERMOSACCHAROLYTICUM", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING CO. NEW YORK, US, (19860701), vol. 4, doi:10.1038/NBT0786-651, ISSN 0733-222X, pages 651 - 654, XP002067773 [A] 1-7 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0786-651 | International search | [A]US6514733 (EMPTAGE MARK [US], et al); | [A]US5599689 (HAYNIE SHARON L [US], et al) | [A] - CAMERON D. ET AL., "Metabolic engineering of propanediol pathways", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (1998), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 116 - 125, XP002939239 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp9701325 | [A] - XIU ZHI-LONG ET AL., "Transient responses and mathematical modeling of Klebsiella pneumoniae to dilution rate and glycerol concentration step in changes in continuous cultures", GAOXIAO HUAXUE GONGCHENG XUEBAO, (2000), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 53 - 58, XP008040401 | Examination | WO2004087936 |