EP1616174 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/03] | DEVICE FOR OPERATING A GAS SENSOR | ||
[2016/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAMER, Berndt Schellingstr. 20 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
TIEFENBACH, Andy Gebersheimer Weg 26 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 03 /
SCHUMANN, Bernd Hegelstr. 34 71277 Rutesheim / DE | 04 /
OCHS, Thorsten Stammheimerstr. 43 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 05 /
SCHICHLEIN, Helge Wilhelmstr. 76 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [2006/03] | Application number, filing date | 04725944.5 | 06.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004EP50455 | Priority number, date | DE2003116645 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316645 | [2006/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004090524 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616174 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616174 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/419, G01N27/406 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
G01N27/419 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2016/44] |
Former [2006/29] | DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES GASSENSORS | [2016/33] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS SENSOR | [2016/33] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DETECTEUR DE GAZ | [2016/33] |
Former [2006/03] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES GASSENSORS | ||
Former [2006/03] | DEVICE FOR OPERATING A GAS SENSOR | ||
Former [2006/03] | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DETECTEUR DE GAZ | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02079769 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT ;CRAMER BERNDT (DE); SCHUMANN BERND (DE)) [X] 1,7,8,10 * page 6, line 5 - page 13, line 23 *; | [X]US2002157452 (CRAMER BERNDT ET AL) [X] 1,6-8,10 * page 2, paragraph 22; figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP0427958 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2,8,10 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5632883 (HOETZEL GERHARD) [X] 1 * column 2, line 62 - line 65; figure 1 * |